EP2024784 - MULTISTABLE REFLECTIVE LIQUID CRYSTAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CY | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZINK TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED 29 Wood Street Stratford-Upon-Avon Warwickshire CV37 6JG / GB | [2012/08] |
Former [2011/49] | For all designated states Sybre Limited 29 Wood Street Stratford upon Avon Warwickshire CV37 6JG / GB | ||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states University of Strathclyde McCance Building, 16 Richmond Street Glasgow G1 1XQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOTTRAM, Nigel University of Strathclyde Department of Mathematics 26 Richmond Street Glasgow G1 1XH / GB | 02 /
DAVIDSON, Andrew University of Strathclyde Department of Mathematics 26 Richmond Street Glasgow G1 1XH / GB | [2012/49] |
Former [2009/08] | 01 /
MOTTRAM, Nigel University of Strathclyde Department of Mathematics 26 Richmond Street Glasgow G1 1XH / GB | ||
02 /
DAVIDSON, Andrew University of Strathclyde Department of Mathematics 26 Richmond Street Glasgow G1 1XH / GB | Representative(s) | Parnham, Kevin, et al Hepworth Browne 29 Wood Street Stratford-upon-Avon Warwickshire, CV37 6JG / GB | [2012/29] |
Former [2011/49] | Parnham, Kevin Hepworth Browne Alcester House 23 Newcastle Drive The Park Nottingham NG7 1AA / GB | ||
Former [2009/08] | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 07733096.7 | 07.06.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007GB02084 | Priority number, date | GB20060011141 | 07.06.2006 Original published format: GB 0611141 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007141525 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2024784 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2024784 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1333, G02F1/139, G02F1/1343, G02F1/1335, G02F1/1337 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
G02F1/1337 (EP,US);
G02F1/1333 (KR);
G02F1/133377 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G02F1/133553 (EP,US);
G02F1/133707 (EP,US);
G02F1/133753 (EP,US);
G02F1/1343 (KR);
G02F1/134363 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | MEHRSTABILE REFLEKTIERENDE FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANORDNUNG | [2009/08] | English: | MULTISTABLE REFLECTIVE LIQUID CRYSTAL DEVICE | [2009/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES REFLECHISSANT MULTISTABLE | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 17.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.03.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2014/09] |
Former [2013/52] | CY | 05.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6469768 (LEE SIN-DOO [KR]) [A] 1,25 * abstract *; | [A]US5978062 (LIANG BAU-JY [TW], et al) [A] 1-28 * column 4, line 26 - column 7, line 43; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1271226 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,25 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5751382 (YAMADA NOBUAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,25 * figures 1-5 *; | [PX]WO2006059128 (UNIV STRATHCLYDE [GB], et al) [PX] 1,6-25 * the whole document * | [DXA] - THURSTON R N ET AL, "MECHANICALLY BISTABLE LIQUID-CRYSTAL DISPLAY STRUCTURES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISACATAWAY, NJ, US, (1980), vol. ED-27, no. 11, ISSN 0018-9383, pages 2069 - 2080, XP000892038 [DX] 1-4,6,8,13,25 * page 2074 - page 2078; figures 9-14 * [A] 7,9,14,15,28 |