EP2029616 - CHEMICAL METHODS AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hammersmith Imanet Limited Cyclotron Building Hammersmith Campus Du Cane Road London W12 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Hammersmith Imanet Limited Cyclotron Building, Hammersmith Campus, DuCane Road London W12 0NN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARSTAD, Erik Hammersmith Imanet Limited Cyclotron Building Hammersmith Hospital Du Cane Road London W12 0NN / GB | 02 /
STEEL, Colin, James Hammersmith Imanet Limited Cyclotron Building Hammersmith Hospital Du Cane Road London W12 0NN / GB | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Bannan, Sally, et al GE Healthcare Limited Intellectual Property Pollards Wood Nightingales Lane Chalfont St.Giles Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Canning, Lewis R., et al GE Healthcare Limited Pollards Wood Nightingales Lane Chalfont St Giles Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB | ||
Former [2013/16] | Bryan, Ian Bennett, et al GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Bucks. HP7 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2009/10] | Hammett, Audrey Grace Campbell GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Bucks. HP7 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07733284.9 | 20.06.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007GB02283 | Priority number, date | US20060805373 | 21.06.2006 Original published format: US 805373 | US20060867612P | 29.11.2006 Original published format: US 867612 P | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007148074 | Date: | 27.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2029616 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/107, A61K51/08, B01J19/00 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
C07K1/13 (EP,US);
A61K51/0453 (EP,US);
A61K51/088 (EP,US);
B01J19/0093 (EP,US);
C07K14/75 (EP,US);
C07K14/78 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00822 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00831 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0086 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00873 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Title | German: | CHEMISCHE VERFAHREN UND GERÄT | [2009/10] | English: | CHEMICAL METHODS AND APPARATUS | [2009/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉS CHIMIQUES ET APPAREILS CORRESPONDANTS | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 24.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 05.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO03101972 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al) [XY] 1-5 * p. 14, l. 28ff, Fig. 4. *; | [Y]WO2005003294 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * par. 330, 337 and Fig. 13V. *; | [AD]WO03006491 (AMERSHAM HEALTH AS [NO], et al) [AD] 1-7 * p. 7, l. 1-p.17. *; | [X]WO2005029042 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 8-11 * p. 13, l. 23-24; p. 14, l. 4-6; claim 11. *; | [X]WO2006025977 (UNIV TUFTS [US], et al) [X] 8-11 * p. 12, l. 7-10. *; | [X]US3207771 (KURT ZOSEL) [X] 8-11 * Fig. 1, col. 3, l. 8-9. *; | [X]US4735063 (BROWN DOUGLAS E [US]) [X] 8-11 * col. 4, l. 21. * |