EP2035599 - ELECTRODE, METHOD OF MANUFACTURE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clarizon Limited Adaptive House Quarrywood Court Livingston West Lothian EH54 6AQ / GB | [2009/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTENSEN, Paul Andrew 11 Copper Chare Morpeth Northumberland NE61 1BS / GB | 02 /
LIN, Wen Feng 141 Holystone Crescent Newcastle-Upon-Tyne NE7 7HA / GB | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 07733299.7 | 19.06.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007GB02299 | Priority number, date | GB20060012094 | 19.06.2006 Original published format: GB 0612094 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007148085 | Date: | 27.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2035599 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2035599 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/13, C25B11/04 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
C25B1/13 (EP,US);
C25B11/061 (EP,US);
C25B11/091 (EP,US);
C25B11/093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODE, IHR HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2009/23] | English: | ELECTRODE, METHOD OF MANUFACTURE AND USE THEREOF | [2009/12] | French: | ÉLECTRODE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2009/12] |
Former [2009/12] | ELEKTRODE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 05.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.03.2011 | BE | 23.03.2011 | CY | 23.03.2011 | CZ | 23.03.2011 | DK | 23.03.2011 | EE | 23.03.2011 | FI | 23.03.2011 | HU | 23.03.2011 | IT | 23.03.2011 | LT | 23.03.2011 | LV | 23.03.2011 | MT | 23.03.2011 | PL | 23.03.2011 | RO | 23.03.2011 | SE | 23.03.2011 | SI | 23.03.2011 | SK | 23.03.2011 | TR | 23.03.2011 | LU | 19.06.2011 | BG | 23.06.2011 | GR | 24.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | ES | 04.07.2011 | IS | 23.07.2011 | PT | 25.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
TR | 23.03.2011 | ||
LU | 19.06.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
LU | 19.06.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 23.03.2011 | |
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3875043 (FRANKS CHARLES R, et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * column 1, line 61 - column 4, line 2 *; | [XA]US3882002 (COOK JR EDWARD H) [X] 1-7,9 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 5; claims 1-4 *[A] 13,16-20,32; | [X]US4040939 (SCHENKER BARRY A, et al) [X] 1-12,14,21-28,33 * column A * * column 4, lines 1-39 *; | [X]US4243503 (LIEB DONALD F, et al) [X] 1-12,15,24-27,29-31,33 * claims 1-3 *; | [XD]WO2004072329 (UNIV HONG KONG [CN], et al) [XD] 1-7,9-12,15,21-27,31,33 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004226829 (CHENG SHAO-AN [CN], et al) [X] 1-7,9-12,15,21-27,31,33 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023]; example 3 *; | [X] - WANG ET AL., "Electrolytic Generation of Ozone on Antimony- and Nickel-Doped Tin Oxide Electrode", J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (20050908), vol. 152, no. 11, pages D197 - D200, XP002459745 [X] 1-12,15,21-27,29-31,33 * the whole document * | [X] - BEAUFILS Y ET AL, "USE OF TI/IRO2/SNO2-SB2O5 ELECTRODES FOR OZONE PRODUCTION", ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY PROCEEDINGS, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, PENNINGTON, NJ, US, (1998), vol. 97-28, ISSN 0161-6374, pages 171 - 186, XP008058582 [X] 1-7,9,10 * abstract * |