EP2047068 - METHOD FOR CHARACTERISING THE PROFILE OF A SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 62 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | [2015/31] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACKSON, Andrew, David 88 Broadway Duffield Derbyshire DE56 4BY / GB | 02 /
WRIGHT, Peter, Ian 2 Sydney Close Mickleover Derby DE3 9LY / GB | 03 /
HOWARD, Michael, Arthur 33 Dennis Close Littleover Derby DE23 7BP / GB | 04 /
STAFFORD, Robert, John 5 Burnham Close West Hallam Derbyshire DE7 6LT / GB | [2017/09] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
JACKSON, Andrew, David 88 Broadway Duffield Derbyshire DE56 4BY / GB | ||
02 /
WRIGHT, Peter, Ian 2 Sydney Close Mickleover Derby DE3 9LY / GB | |||
03 /
HOWARD, Michael, Arthur 33 Dennis Close Littleover Derby DE23 7BP / GB | |||
04 /
STAFFORD, Robert, John 5 Burnham Close West Hallam Derbyshire DE7 6LT / GB | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/21] | Barcock, Ruth Anita, et al Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/16] | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07733306.0 | 21.06.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007GB02307 | Priority number, date | GB20060014423 | 20.07.2006 Original published format: GB 0614423 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008009878 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2047068 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2047068 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01B21/20, F01D5/14, G05B19/401 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
G01B21/20 (EP,US);
G05B19/4099 (EP,US);
F05D2250/74 (EP,US);
G05B2219/34145 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35016 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35128 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35131 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35193 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37064 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/16] | F01D5/14, G01B21/20, G05B19/401 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [2017/09] |
Former [2009/34] | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG DES PROFILS EINER FLÄCHE | [2009/16] | English: | METHOD FOR CHARACTERISING THE PROFILE OF A SURFACE | [2009/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR CARACTÉRISER LE PROFIL D'UNE SURFACE | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 21.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 29.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 01.03.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2018/21] |
Former [2017/47] | SE | 01.03.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6212481 (KUME SHIGEFUMI [JP]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * column 3, line 5 - column 7, line 30 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2003188445 (KADOWAKI SOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0144] * * figures 1-7 *; | [X]US6711530 (KASE KIWAMU [JP]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * column 1, line 50 - column 5, line 22 ** figures 1,2 * |