EP2044063 - PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states Astra Zeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUTTAR, David AstraZeneca R & D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 02 /
FOOTE, Kevin, Michael AstraZeneca R & D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 03 /
NOWAK, Thorsten AstraZeneca R & D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 04 /
RUDGE, David, Alan AstraZeneca R & D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 05 /
THEOCLITOU, Maria-Elena AstraZeneca R & D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 06 /
THOMAS, Andrew, Peter AstraZeneca R & D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [2009/15] | Application number, filing date | 07733374.8 | 27.06.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007GB02381 | Priority number, date | US20060818259P | 30.06.2006 Original published format: US 818259 P | US20070908428P | 28.03.2007 Original published format: US 908428 P | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008001070 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2044063 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/14, A61K31/506, A61P35/00 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
C07D413/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 30.01.2009 | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS GEEIGNETE PYRIMIDINDERIVATE | [2009/15] | English: | PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF CANCER | [2009/15] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PYRIMIDINE UTILES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 03.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 07.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO03048133 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-49 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2005040159 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-49 * page 39 *; | [Y]WO2005049033 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-49 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2006074057 (EXELIXIS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-49* example - * |