EP2026852 - METAL IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accentus Medical PLC 528. 10 Unit 2 Rutherford Avenue Harwell Oxford Didcot Oxfordshire OX11 0DF / GB | [2011/10] |
Former [2010/32] | For all designated states Accentus Medical plc 3rd Floor, 11 Strand London WC2N 5HR / GB | ||
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Accentus Plc 3rd Floor, 11 Strand London WC2N 5HR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRENTICE, Thomas, Campbell 5, Agricola Walk Andover Hampshire SP10 5JL / GB | 02 /
PICKFORD, Martin, Edward, Lee 37 Downland Close Locks Heath Southampton Hampshire SO31 6WB / GB | 03 /
LEWIS, David, Richard 26, Alexander Close Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 1XA / GB | 04 /
TURNER, Andrew, Derek 17, Loyd Close Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 1XR / GB | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Mansfield, Peter Turquand, et al Coller IP Management Limited Fugro House Hithercroft Road Wallingford, Oxfordshire OX10 9RB / GB | [2010/09] |
Former [2009/09] | Ratcliffe, Susan Margaret, et al Coller IP Management Fugro House Hithercroft Road Wallingford Oxfordshire OX10 9RB / GB | Application number, filing date | 07733748.3 | 11.06.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007GB50327 | Priority number, date | GB20060011437 | 12.06.2006 Original published format: GB 0611437 | GB20070000713 | 15.01.2007 Original published format: GB 0700713 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007144667 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2026852 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2026852 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/06, A61L27/36, A61L27/04, A61L27/54 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
A61L27/047 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/32 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2300/104 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2300/112 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2300/606 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLIMPLANTATE | [2009/09] | English: | METAL IMPLANTS | [2009/09] | French: | IMPLANTS MÉTALLIQUES | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11150098.9 / EP2316499 | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.01.2011 | CZ | 12.01.2011 | EE | 12.01.2011 | FI | 12.01.2011 | HU | 12.01.2011 | LT | 12.01.2011 | LV | 12.01.2011 | MT | 12.01.2011 | RO | 12.01.2011 | SI | 12.01.2011 | SK | 12.01.2011 | BG | 12.04.2011 | GR | 13.04.2011 | IS | 12.05.2011 | PT | 12.05.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/21] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
MT | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
MT | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 12.01.2011 | |
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03089023 (ACCENTUS PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,13 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 27 *; | [X]WO03094774 (PLASMA COATINGS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 28 - line 30 * * page 3, line 31 - line 32 * * page 4, line 30 *; | [DA]WO2005087982 (ACCENTUS PLC [GB], et al) [DA] 1-13* page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 3 *; | [X]WO2006058906 (TORINO POLITECNICO [IT], et al) [X] 1,5,9,10,12 * page 3; claim - *; | [X] - M. SHIRKHANZADEH ET AL., "Bioactive delivery systems for the slow release of antibiotics: incorporation of Ag+ ions into micro-porous hydroxyapatite coatings.", MATERIALS LETTERS, (1995), vol. 24, no. 1,2,3, pages 7 - 12, XP002482744 [X] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-577X(95)00059-3 | by applicant | WO03089023 | WO03094774 | WO2006058906 | - M. SHIRKHANZADEH, MATERIALS LETTERS, (1995), vol. 24, pages 7 - 12 |