EP2013203 - Process for the preparation of 5-(2-bromoethyl)-6-chloro-1,3-dihydro-2H-indol-2-one [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/03] | NOVEL PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF 5-{2-Ý4-(1,2-BENZISOTHIAZOL-3-YL)-1-PIPERAZINYL -ETHYL}-6-CHLORO-1,3-DIHYDRO-2H-INDOL-2-ONE (ZIPRASIDONE) | ||
[2010/17] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richter Gedeon Nyrt. Gyömröi út 19-21 1103 Budapest / HU | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEU, József Hegedüs Gyula u. 44/B H-1133 Budapest / HU | 02 /
TÖRLEY, József Katona József u. 41 H-1137 Budapest / HU | 03 /
GARADNAY, Sándor Bánomi Iakótelep 12 H-2500 Esztergom / HU | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07733855.6 | 02.05.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007HU00038 | Priority number, date | HU20060000347 | 02.05.2006 Original published format: HU 0600347 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007125374 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2013203 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/12 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
C07D417/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Extension states | AL | 05.11.2008 | BA | 05.11.2008 | HR | 05.11.2008 | MK | 05.11.2008 | RS | 05.11.2008 | Title | German: | Prozess zur Herstellung von 5-(2-bromoethyl)-6-chloro-1,3-dihydro-2H-indol-2-one | [2010/17] | English: | Process for the preparation of 5-(2-bromoethyl)-6-chloro-1,3-dihydro-2H-indol-2-one | [2010/17] | French: | Procede de production de 5-(2-bromoethyl)-6-chloro-1,3-dihydro-2H-indol-2-one | [2010/17] |
Former [2009/03] | NEUES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 5-{2-[4-(1,2-BENZISOTHIAZOL-3-YL)-1-PIPERAZINYL]ETHYL}-6-CHLOR-1,3-DIHYDRO-2H-INDOL-2-ON (ZIPRASIDON) | ||
Former [2009/03] | NOVEL PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF 5-{2-Ý4-(1,2-BENZISOTHIAZOL-3-YL)-1-PIPERAZINYL -ETHYL}-6-CHLORO-1,3-DIHYDRO-2H-INDOL-2-ONE (ZIPRASIDONE) | ||
Former [2009/03] | NOUVEAU PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE 5-{2-Ý4-(1,2-BENZISOTHIAZOL-3-YL)-1-PIPÉRAZINYL -ÉTHYL}-6-CHLORO-1,3-DIHYDRO-2H-INDOL-2-ONE (ZIPRASIDONE) | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 28.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/12] | 03.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO2005085240 (RANBAXY LAB LTD [IN], et al) [DX] 4,5* examples 2,3,5 * |