EP2008212 - INDIVIDUAL ASSESSMENT AND CLASSIFICATION OF COMPLEX DISEASES BY A DATA-BASED CLINICAL DISEASE PROFILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cobedix AG Stapfetenstrasse 18 8345 Adetswil / CH | [2015/44] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Biebermann, Barbara Thiersteinerrain 90 4059 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states Kantonsspital Bruderholz 4101 Bruderholz /BL / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/09] |
Former [2009/01] | 01 /
BIEDERMANN, Barbara C. Thiersteinerrain 90 4059 Basel / CH | Representative(s) | Liebetanz, Michael, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Liebetanz, Michael, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 07734236.8 | 05.04.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007IB00917 | Priority number, date | US20060744460P | 07.04.2006 Original published format: US 744460 P | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007116295 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2008212 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
G16H50/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Title | German: | INDIVIDUELLE BEWERTUNG UND KLASSIFIZIERUNG KOMPLEXER ERKRANKUNGEN MITTELS DATENBASIERTEN KLINISCHEN KRANKHEITSPROFILS | [2009/01] | English: | INDIVIDUAL ASSESSMENT AND CLASSIFICATION OF COMPLEX DISEASES BY A DATA-BASED CLINICAL DISEASE PROFILE | [2009/01] | French: | ÉVALUATION INDIVIDUELLE ET CLASSIFICATION DE MALADIES COMPLEXES AU MOYEN D'UN PROFIL CLINIQUE DE MALADIE BASÉ SUR DES DONNÉES | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 19.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 11.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.11.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 30.11.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2009 | 30.04.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |