EP2001310 - SUPPLEMENT MIXTURE FOR DIETETIC FOOD DESTINED FOR CELIACS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giuliani S.p.A. Via P. Palagi 2 20129 Milano / IT | [2010/12] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states Giuliani S.P.A. Via P. Palagi 2 20129 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIULIANI, Giammaria Via Mascheroni, 2 I-20123 Milano / IT | 02 /
BENEDUSI, Anna Via N. Sauro, 9 I-20124 Milano / IT | [2009/21] |
Former [2008/51] | 01 /
GIULIANI, Giammaria Via Mascheroni, 1 I-20123 Milano / IT | ||
02 /
BENEDUSI, Anna Via N. Sauro, 9 I-20124 Milano / IT | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07734308.5 | 03.04.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007IB00989 | Priority number, date | IT2006MI00669 | 05.04.2006 Original published format: IT MI20060669 | [2008/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007113678 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2001310 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2001310 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/29, A23L1/10, A21D2/00, A21D13/00, A23L3/00 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
A21D13/066 (EP);
A23L33/105 (EP);
A23L33/14 (EP);
A23L33/15 (EP);
A23L33/30 (EP);
A23L7/198 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERGÄNZUNGSMITTELMISCHUNG FÜR DIÄTISCHE NAHRUNG, DIE FÜR MENSCHEN MIT ZÖLIAKIE BESTIMMT IST | [2008/51] | English: | SUPPLEMENT MIXTURE FOR DIETETIC FOOD DESTINED FOR CELIACS | [2008/51] | French: | MELANGE DE COMPLEMENTS POUR ALIMENTS DIETETIQUES DESTINES AUX PERSONNES ATTEINTES DE LA MALADIE CELIAQUE | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.03.2010 | CZ | 24.03.2010 | EE | 24.03.2010 | LT | 24.03.2010 | LV | 24.03.2010 | RO | 24.03.2010 | SI | 24.03.2010 | SK | 24.03.2010 | TR | 24.03.2010 | BG | 24.06.2010 | IS | 24.07.2010 | HU | 25.09.2010 | [2018/43] |
Former [2015/13] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
TR | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
Former [2013/16] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
TR | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
TR | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 24.03.2010 | |
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | CZ | 24.03.2010 | |
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/41] | CZ | 24.03.2010 | |
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.04.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 24.03.2010 | |
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.04.2010 | ||
IT | 03.04.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | LT | 24.03.2010 | |
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005025319 (SOIL & CROP CRUISE CONTROL B V [NL], et al) [X] 1-13 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US2005158446 (LESTER LINDA K [US], et al) [X] 1-13* example -; claim - * |