EP2002632 - Delay Mismatch Compensation Using a Low Complexity Structure in Signal Transmitters with Digital and Analog Components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/51] | TRANSMITTER WITH DELAY MISMATCH COMPENSATION | ||
[2015/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2009/50] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELFENSTEIN, Markus c/o NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 A-1102 Vienna / AT | 02 /
LAMPE, Alexander c/o NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 A-1102 Vienna / AT | [2015/43] |
Former [2008/51] | 01 /
HELFENSTEIN, Markus c/o NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 A-1102 Vienna / AT | ||
02 /
LAMPE, Alexander c/o NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 A-1102 Vienna / AT | Representative(s) | Zapalowicz, Francis Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2015/43] |
Former [2009/12] | Zapalowicz, Francis Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/12] | Röggla, Harald NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1101 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2008/51] | Röggla, Harald NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH IP Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1101 Vienna / AT | Application number, filing date | 07735179.9 | 19.03.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007IB50953 | Priority number, date | EP20060300292 | 28.03.2006 Original published format: EP 06300292 | [2008/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007110805 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2002632 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2002632 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/36, H04L25/49, H04L27/00 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
H04L27/364 (EP,US);
H04L25/49 (EP,US);
H04L27/367 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0016 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/51] | H04L27/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/43] |
Former [2008/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 28.10.2008 | BA | 28.10.2008 | HR | 28.10.2008 | MK | 28.10.2008 | RS | 28.10.2008 | Title | German: | Signalverzögerungsversatzkompenstation unter Verwendung einer Struktur niedriger Komplexität in Signalsendern mit digitalen und analogen Komponenten | [2015/01] | English: | Delay Mismatch Compensation Using a Low Complexity Structure in Signal Transmitters with Digital and Analog Components | [2015/01] | French: | Compensation du décalage de délai en utilisant une structure de complexité basse dans des transmitteurs contenant des composants numériques et analogiques | [2015/01] |
Former [2008/51] | SENDER MIT KOMPENSATION VON VERZÖGERUNGSFEHLANPASSUNG | ||
Former [2008/51] | TRANSMITTER WITH DELAY MISMATCH COMPENSATION | ||
Former [2008/51] | ÉMETTEUR À COMPENSATION DE NON-CONCORDANCE DE DÉLAI | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 16.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2007 | AT | 21.10.2015 | BE | 21.10.2015 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | CZ | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | ES | 21.10.2015 | FI | 21.10.2015 | IT | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | NL | 21.10.2015 | PL | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | SE | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | GR | 22.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | IE | 19.03.2016 | LU | 19.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 19.03.2007 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
IE | 19.03.2016 | ||
LU | 19.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.03.2007 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
IE | 19.03.2016 | ||
LU | 19.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
IE | 19.03.2016 | ||
LU | 19.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
IE | 19.03.2016 | ||
LU | 19.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
LU | 19.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
LU | 19.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
LU | 19.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US6670900 (ZHANG YIFENG [US]) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 3 * * column 2, line 18 - column 5, line 35 ** figure 1 *; | [A]DE102004001998 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0052] * * paragraphs [0074] - [0108] * * paragraphs [0118] - [0151] * * figures 2,4,7-11 *; | [X]WO2004082232 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - line 17 * * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 4 * * page 4, line 9 - line 18 * * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 9 * * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 27 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2006008030 (LUKE CHRISTIAN G [GB], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0007] , [0008] * * paragraphs [0010] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0032] * * figures 4-6 * |