EP2013882 - MEMORY CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR SENSING A MEMORY ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2009/50] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STORMS, Maurits, M.N. NXP Semiconductors IP Department HTC 60 1.31 Prof Holstlaan 4 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2012/42] |
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
STORMS, Maurits, M.N. NXP Semiconductors IP Department HTC 60 1.31 Prof Holstlaan 4 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. IP & Licensing Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/42] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/42] | Röggla, Harald NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1101 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2009/03] | Röggla, Harald NXP Semiconductors IP Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1100 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 07735550.1 | 19.04.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007IB51414 | Priority number, date | EP20060112988 | 24.04.2006 Original published format: EP 06112988 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007122564 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2013882 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2013882 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/4091, G11C7/06 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
G11C7/067 (EP,US);
G11C2207/063 (EP,US);
G11C2207/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Extension states | AL | 24.11.2008 | BA | 24.11.2008 | HR | 24.11.2008 | MK | 24.11.2008 | RS | 24.11.2008 | Title | German: | SPEICHERSCHALTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABTASTEN EINES SPEICHERELEMENTS | [2009/03] | English: | MEMORY CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR SENSING A MEMORY ELEMENT | [2009/03] | French: | CIRCUIT DE MÉMOIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE MÉMOIRE | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2007 | AT | 17.10.2012 | BE | 17.10.2012 | CY | 17.10.2012 | CZ | 17.10.2012 | DK | 17.10.2012 | EE | 17.10.2012 | FI | 17.10.2012 | IT | 17.10.2012 | LT | 17.10.2012 | LV | 17.10.2012 | MC | 17.10.2012 | MT | 17.10.2012 | NL | 17.10.2012 | PL | 17.10.2012 | RO | 17.10.2012 | SE | 17.10.2012 | SI | 17.10.2012 | SK | 17.10.2012 | TR | 17.10.2012 | BG | 17.01.2013 | GR | 18.01.2013 | ES | 28.01.2013 | IS | 17.02.2013 | PT | 18.02.2013 | IE | 19.04.2013 | LU | 19.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
MT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
TR | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
IE | 19.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
MT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
IE | 19.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
IE | 19.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 17.10.2012 | |
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 17.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0329141 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 7 * * column 6, line 53 - column 9, line 47 *; | [A]US5926428 (RAO G R MOHAN [US]) [A] 1-3 * figure 5 * * abstract * * column 10, line 44 - column 11, line 36 *; | [A]US2002057597 (FUCHIGAMI IKUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0067] - [0076] * | by applicant | US5200924 | EP0329141 |