EP2047717 - LED BACKLIGHT FOR LCD WITH COLOR UNIFORMITY RECALIBRATION OVER LIFETIME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] | Applicant(s) | For:MC
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For all designated states Philips Lumileds Lighting Company, LLC. 370 W. Trimble Road San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANKHORST, Martijn, H., R. c/o 370 West Trimble Road San José, CA 95131 / US | 02 /
GROOTES, Pieter c/o 370 West Trimble Road San José, CA 95131 / US | 03 /
HENDRIKS, Robert, F., M. c/o 370 West Trimble Road San José, CA 95131 / US | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Bekkers, Joost J.J Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 07736085.7 | 05.06.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007IB52107 | Priority number, date | US20060423412 | 09.06.2006 Original published format: US 423412 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007141732 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2047717 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08, G09G3/34 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
G09G3/342 (EP,US);
H05B45/22 (EP,US);
H05B45/3725 (EP,US);
H05B45/46 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0233 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0633 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0666 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0693 (EP,US);
G09G2360/147 (EP,US);
Y10S362/80 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LED-RÜCKLICHT FÜR EIN LCD MIT FARBGLEICHFÖRMIGKEITS-NEUKALIBRATION ÜBER DIE LEBENSZEIT | [2009/16] | English: | LED BACKLIGHT FOR LCD WITH COLOR UNIFORMITY RECALIBRATION OVER LIFETIME | [2009/16] | French: | PANNEAU LUMINEUX DEL POUR LCD AVEC RECALIBRAGE DE L'UNIFORMITÉ DES COULEURS SUR LA DURÉE DE VIE | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 15.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/33] | 01.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6633301 (DALLAS JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003230991 (MUTHU SUBRAMANIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005117190 (IWAUCHI KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1562170 (HUNET INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [A]EP1619656 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [X]US2006049781 (LEE JOON-CHOK [MY], et al) [X] 1-26 * the whole document * |