EP2006064 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A FIBER-REINFORCED MOLDED PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/52] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FIBER-REINFORCED RESIN | ||
[2019/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKIDO, Toshihide Grandmezon 704, 8-40, Nagara 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 5200046 / JP | 02 /
TAKEMOTO, Hidehiro 1451, Tsutsui, Masaki-cho Iyo-gun, Ehime 7913120 / JP | 03 /
TSUJI, Seiji 1451, Tsutsui, Masaki-cho Iyo-gun, Ehime 7913120 / JP | 04 /
TANAKA, Shintaro Kopo Yayoi 202, 5-5, Misono-cho 1-chome Anjo-shi, Aichi 4460076 / JP | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2020/26] |
Former [2008/52] | Görz, Ingo Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07737593.9 | 01.03.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007JP53913 | Priority number, date | JP20060062432 | 08.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006062432 | [2008/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007102395 | Date: | 13.09.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2006064 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2006064 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | [2009/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2006064 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29C39/10, B29C70/06, B29C70/54, B29C70/34, B29C70/48, // B29K105/08 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
B29C70/345 (EP,US);
B29C39/10 (KR);
B29C39/02 (KR);
B29C70/48 (EP,US);
B29C70/547 (EP);
D06M17/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2008/52] | B29C39/10, B29C70/06, B29K105/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2020/26] |
Former [2009/16] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES FASERVERSTÄRKTEN PRODUKTS | [2019/02] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A FIBER-REINFORCED MOLDED PRODUCT | [2019/02] | French: | PROCESSUS DE FABRICATION D'UN OBJET RENFORCÉ DE FIBRES | [2019/02] |
Former [2008/52] | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES FASERVERSTÄRKTEN HARZES | ||
Former [2008/52] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FIBER-REINFORCED RESIN | ||
Former [2008/52] | PROCESSUS DE FABRICATION DE RÉSINE RENFORCÉE DE FIBRE | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2008 | Translation filed | 07.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 09.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 17.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 24.06.2020 | SE | 24.06.2020 | [2021/10] |
Former [2020/49] | SE | 24.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6203749 (LOVING DAVID [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1, 3; claim 1 *; | [A]JP2004299178 (TOHO TENAX CO LTD) [A] 1-10* figures 1(a)-1(c); claims 1-7 *; | [A]JP2005232601 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-10 * figure 3; example 2 *; | [A]US2006035546 (MACK PATRICK E [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]JP2000043172 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2002192535 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X]JP2004299178 (TOHO TENAX CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005271248 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) |