EP1995082 - RUBBER-COATED RFID MODULE, AND PNEUMATIC TIRE HAVING THE MODULE EMBEDDED THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEHARA, Tsuyoshi c/o THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 2548601 / JP | 02 /
TSUJI, Takue c/o THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 2548601 / JP | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07737719.0 | 26.02.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007JP54107 | Priority number, date | JP20060050725 | 27.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006050725 | [2008/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007100111 | Date: | 07.09.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1995082 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60C19/00, B60C1/00, G06K19/07, G06K19/077 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
B60C1/00 (EP,US);
B60C23/0408 (EP,US);
G06K19/07764 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10495 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/14] |
Former [2008/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT KAUTSCHUK BESCHICHTETES RFID-MODUL UND LUFTREIFEN MIT DARIN EINGEBETTETEM MODUL | [2008/48] | English: | RUBBER-COATED RFID MODULE, AND PNEUMATIC TIRE HAVING THE MODULE EMBEDDED THEREIN | [2008/48] | French: | MODULE RFID REVETU DE CAOUTCHOUC ET PNEUMATIQUE LE COMPORTANT INCLUS DANS CELUI-CI | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2008 | Translation filed | 17.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 30.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/49] | 12.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1580041 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0007] , [0016] , [0017]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2004159383 (ADAMSON JOHN DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0017] - [0023]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]WO9929523 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 14; figures 1-8; claim 38; tables 3,4 * | International search | [X]JP2001525282 ; | [Y]JP2005096423 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [Y]JP2005323339 (MICHELIN SOC TECH, et al); | [A]JPH05169931 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER) | by applicant | JP2005170065 | JP2005170222 | JP2000108621 | JP2005096726 | JP2002271127 |