EP1994879 - IMAGE ANALYSIS DEVICE AND IMAGE ANALYSIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/48] | IMAGE ANALYZING DEVICE AND IMAGE ANALYZING METHOD | ||
[2011/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Hideki c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 02 /
NISHIMURA, Hirokazu c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA, Kenji c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 04 /
INOUE, Ryoko c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 05 /
SAWA, Miho c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2011/24] |
Former [2008/48] | 01 /
TANAKA, Hideki c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
NISHIMURA, Hirokazu c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagay 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAMURA, Kenji c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagay 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
04 /
INOUE, Ryoko c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagay 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
05 /
SAWA, Miho c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagay 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/48] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07737787.7 | 05.03.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007JP54212 | Priority number, date | JP20060069817 | 14.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006069817 | [2008/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007105516 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1994879 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1994879 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/04, G06T1/00, G06T7/60 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T11/203 (EP,US);
G06T7/12 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10068 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30032 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/15] |
Former [2008/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDANALYSEGERÄT UND BILDANALYSEVERFAHREN | [2008/48] | English: | IMAGE ANALYSIS DEVICE AND IMAGE ANALYSIS METHOD | [2011/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE D'IMAGES ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE D'IMAGES | [2008/48] |
Former [2008/48] | IMAGE ANALYZING DEVICE AND IMAGE ANALYZING METHOD | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2008 | Translation filed | 12.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 15.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 05.03.2012 | FR | 02.04.2012 | [2013/10] |
Former [2013/07] | FR | 02.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2002164060 (PAIK DAVID S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * paragraphs [0031] , [0033] , [0036] , [0037]; figures 7,8,10 * [Y] 4; | [X]JP2005192880 (OLYMPUS CORP) [X] 1,6-8 * figures 15-17; claim 9 *; | [Y] - HISAYAMA K ET AL, Fukuso PARCOR keisu o Riyo Shita Keijo Ninshiki ni Motozuku Daicho Polyp no Jido Kenshutsu -Automated Detection for Colonic Polyps Based on Recognition of Shape by Using Complex Partial Correlation Coefficient, JOURNAL OF THE JAPAN SOCIETY FOR COMPUTER AIDED SURGERY, XX, JP, PAGE(S) 291 - 292, (20041210), XP003018111 [Y] 4 * see abstract * | International search | [X]JPH04193254 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [Y] - HISAYAMA K. ET AL., "Fukuso PARCOR keisu o Riyo Shita Keijo Ninshiki ni Motozuku Daicho Polyp no Jido Kenshutsu", DAI 13 KAI JAPAN SOCIETY OF COMPUTER AIDED SURGERY, DAI 14 KAI COMPUTER AIDED DIAGNOSIS OF MEDICAL IMAGES GODO RONBUNSHU, (20041210), pages 291 - 292, XP003018111 | by applicant | JP2005157902 | JP2006069817 | - DIGESTIVE ENDOSCOPY, (2001), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 349 - 354 | - THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS TRANSACTIONS D-II, (199006), vol. J73-D-II, no. 6, pages 804 - 811 |