EP2003944 - METHOD OF EBULLIENT COOLING, EBULLIENT COOLING APPARATUS, FLOW CHANNEL STRUCTURE AND APPLICATION PRODUCT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokyo University Of Science Educational Foundation Administrative Organization 1-3 Kagurazaka Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8601 / JP | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Koichi c/o Tokyo University Science Educational Foundation Administrative Organization 3, Kagurazaka 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8601 / JP | 02 /
GOTO, Yosuke 73-9, Oaza Ike, Yoshii-machi Tano-gun Gunma 370-2107 / JP | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07737855.2 | 06.03.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007JP54308 | Priority number, date | JP20060059840 | 06.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006059840 | JP20060236404 | 31.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006236404 | [2008/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007102498 | Date: | 13.09.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2003944 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2003944 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, F28D15/02, H01L23/427 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
H01L23/44 (EP,US);
F28D15/02 (EP,US);
F28D15/0266 (EP,US);
F28F1/40 (EP,US);
H01L23/427 (EP,US);
H05K7/20936 (EP,US);
F28F2245/02 (EP,US);
F28F2265/28 (EP,US);
F28F2265/30 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/16] |
Former [2008/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SIEDEKÜHLUNG, SIEDEKÜHLVORRICHTUNG, STRÖMUNGSKANALSTRUKTUR UND ANWENDUNGSPRODUKT DAFÜR | [2008/51] | English: | METHOD OF EBULLIENT COOLING, EBULLIENT COOLING APPARATUS, FLOW CHANNEL STRUCTURE AND APPLICATION PRODUCT THEREOF | [2008/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE REFROIDISSEMENT PAR EBULLITION, STRUCTURE DE CANAL D'ECOULEMENT ET PRODUITS ISSUS DE LEUR APPLICATION | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2008 | Translation filed | 06.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 06.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 07.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 23.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003053298 (YAMADA KAZUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6-11,15-22,24-29* figure 1 *; | [A]US2005022979 (CHEN CHEI-CHIANG [TW], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6-11,15-22,24-29 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO2006023737 (INNOVATIVE FLUIDICS INC [US], et al) [X] 29 * paragraphs [0022] - [0056]; figures 1-6 * [A] 1,2,4,6-11,15-22,24-28; | [A] - OHTA, H., OHNO, T., HIOKI, F. AND SHINMOTO, Y., "Development of a High-Performance Boiling Heat Exchanger by Improved Liquid Supply to Narrow Channels.", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20041130), vol. 1027, doi:10.1196/annals.1324.019, pages 217 - 234, XP002635006 [A] 1,2,4,6-11,15-22,24-29 * page 221; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1196/ANNALS.1324.019 | [A] - KOICHI SUZUKI,HIROSHI SAITOH, KAZUAKI MATSUMOTO, "High Heat Flux Cooling by Microbubble Emission Boiling", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20021001), vol. 974, doi:10.1111/j.1749-6632.2002.tb05919.x, pages 364 - 377, XP002635007 [A] 1,2,4,6-11,15-22,24-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.2002.tb05919.X | International search | [X]JPH0387177U ; | [Y]JPH1038481 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]WO2004106822 (ICURIE LAB HOLDINGS LTD [GB], et al); | [Y]JP2005079337 (TOSHIBA CORP) | by applicant | JPS6154654 | JPH05136305 | JP2000103645 | JP2000144052 | JP2000329406 | JP3147251B | JP2001336890 | JP3259931B | JP2002062069 | JP3340149B | JP2005055066 | JP2005079337 | - "Subcooled Flow Boiling Accompanied by Microbubble Emission", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 41TH NATIONAL HEAT TRANSFER SYMPOSIUM, (200406), vol. 1, pages 19 - 20 |