EP1995040 - PROCESS, AND APPARATUS, FOR PRODUCING REINFORCING FIBER MOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Tamotsu 15-B4-33, Sonoyama 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0842 / JP | 02 /
TSUKAMOTO, Masatoshi 1451-4-6, Tsutsui Masakicho Iyo-gun Ehime 791-3120 / JP | 03 /
ASAHARA, Nobuo 11-2, Hatsuhicho 2-chome Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-0028 / JP | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07738005.3 | 08.03.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007JP54514 | Priority number, date | JP20060062427 | 08.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006062427 | [2008/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007102573 | Date: | 13.09.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1995040 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C53/04, B29C43/18, B29C70/06, B29K105/08 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
B29C53/04 (EP,US);
B29C43/203 (EP,US);
B29C70/46 (EP,US);
B29C70/50 (EP,US);
B29C2043/3613 (EP,US);
B29C2043/3621 (EP,US);
B29C43/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/003 (EP,US);
B29L2031/772 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1034 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FORMTEILS MIT VERSTÄRKUNGSFASERN | [2008/48] | English: | PROCESS, AND APPARATUS, FOR PRODUCING REINFORCING FIBER MOLDING | [2008/48] | French: | PROCESSUS ET APPAREIL DE FABRICATION DE MOULAGE DE FIBRE DE RENFORT | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2008 | Translation filed | 27.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 10.09.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4151031 (GOAD ROBERT C [US], et al); | [A]JPH01285315 (KOSEINO JUSHI SHINSEIZO GIJUTS); | [A]JP3628965B ; | [AP]JP2006233120 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | JP2001191418 | JP2005324513 |