EP2006919 - GROUP III NITRIDE SEMICONDUCTOR LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING GROUP III NITRIDE SEMICONDUCTOR LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE, AND LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Haruhinagahata Kiyosu-shi Aichi 452-8564 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1 Haruhinagahata Kiyosu-shi Aichi 452-8564 / JP | ||
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKI, Hisayuki c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K. 5-1, Yawata Kaigan dori Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290-0067 / JP | 02 /
SAKAI, Hiromitsu c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K., 5-1, Yawata Kaigan dori Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290-0067 / JP | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2009/51] |
Former [2008/52] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07739485.6 | 23.03.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007JP56044 | Priority number, date | JP20060082473 | 24.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006082473 | [2008/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007111255 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2006919 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/02, H01L33/00, // H01L33/04 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
H01L33/02 (EP,US);
H01L33/007 (EP,US);
H01L33/025 (EP,US);
H01L21/02381 (EP,US);
H01L21/02458 (EP,US);
H01L21/02507 (EP,US);
H01L21/0254 (EP,US);
H01L21/02573 (EP,US);
H01L21/0262 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L33/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2008/52] | H01L33/00, H01L21/205 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Title | German: | GRUPPE-III-NITRID-HALBLEITER-LEUCHTANORDNUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GRUPPE-III-NITRID-HALBLEITER-LEUCHTANORDNUNG UND LAMPE | [2008/52] | English: | GROUP III NITRIDE SEMICONDUCTOR LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING GROUP III NITRIDE SEMICONDUCTOR LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE, AND LAMP | [2008/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DE NITRURE DE GROUPE III, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DE NITRURE DE GROUPE III, ET LAMPE | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2008 | Translation filed | 13.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 05.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/43] | 19.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2005104251 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 25, lines 1-12 * * page 27, line 29 - page 33, line 21 * * page 14, lines 21-24 * * page 15, line 34 - page 17, line 4 * * page 12, line 33 - page 13, line 2 ** page 10, lines 28-37 * | International search | [A]JP2001320085 (TOYODA GOSEI KK); | [A]JP2002094112 (TOYODA GOSEI KK); | [X]JP2003142730 (SANKEN ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2003234542 (XEROX CORP); | [A]JP2005229085 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH) | Examination | WO2005114754 | by applicant | JPS553834B | JP2000332364 | JP2003229645 | JP2006082473 |