EP2009084 - LUBE BASE OIL, PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Oil Corporation 3-12, Nishi-shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8412 / JP | For all designated states Petroleum Energy Center 3-9, Toranomon 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANO, Takashi c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 02 /
SHIRAHAMA, Shinichi c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 03 /
TAGAWA, Kazuo c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 04 /
KOMIYA, Kenichi c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 05 /
MATSUI, Shigeki c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 06 /
KUROSAWA, Osamu c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | [2013/35] |
Former [2009/01] | 01 /
SANO, Takashi c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION, 8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIRAHAMA, Shinichi c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION, 8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | |||
03 /
TAGAWA, Kazuo c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION, 8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | |||
04 /
KOMIYA, Kenichi c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION, 8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | |||
05 /
MATSUI, Shigeki c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION, 8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | |||
06 /
KUROSAWA, Osamu c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION, 8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07740004.2 | 28.03.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007JP56566 | Priority number, date | JP20060100175 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006100175 | JP20060100204 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006100204 | JP20060187078 | 06.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006187078 | JP20060187084 | 06.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006187084 | JP20060187087 | 06.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006187087 | JP20060187092 | 06.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006187092 | [2009/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007114132 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2009084 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2009084 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C10M171/00, C10M101/02, C10M169/04, C10M177/00, C10M135/00, C10M137/00, C10M145/14, C10N20/00, C10N20/02, C10N30/00, C10N30/02, C10N30/06, C10N30/08, C10N30/10, C10N40/04, C10N40/25, C10N70/00 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
C10G73/02 (KR);
C10M101/02 (EP);
C10M105/06 (KR);
C10M169/04 (EP);
C10M171/00 (EP,KR);
C10M177/00 (EP);
C10M2207/026 (EP);
C10M2207/028 (EP);
C10M2207/262 (EP);
C10M2207/289 (EP);
C10M2209/084 (EP);
C10M2209/086 (EP);
C10M2215/04 (EP);
C10M2215/064 (EP);
C10M2215/223 (EP);
C10M2215/28 (EP);
C10M2217/06 (EP);
C10M2219/046 (EP);
C10M2219/066 (EP);
C10M2219/068 (EP);
C10M2219/089 (EP);
C10M2219/106 (EP);
C10M2223/04 (EP);
C10M2223/045 (EP);
C10N2020/013 (EP);
C10N2020/015 (EP);
C10N2020/02 (EP);
C10N2020/065 (EP);
C10N2020/071 (EP);
C10N2030/02 (EP);
C10N2030/06 (EP,KR);
C10N2030/08 (EP);
C10N2030/10 (EP);
C10N2030/45 (EP);
C10N2030/54 (EP);
C10N2030/74 (EP);
C10N2040/04 (EP);
C10N2040/08 (EP);
C10N2040/25 (EP);
C10N2060/09 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M2207/262, C10N2010/04 (EP);
C10M2215/04, C10N2010/12 (EP);
C10M2215/28, C10N2060/14 (EP);
C10M2219/046, C10N2010/04 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMIERSTOFFGRUNDÖL, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND SCHMIERÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2009/01] | English: | LUBE BASE OIL, PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITION | [2009/01] | French: | HUILE DE GRAISSAGE DE BASE, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET COMPOSITION D'HUILE LUBRIFIANTE | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2008 | Translation filed | 31.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 06.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2013 | 13.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2007 | AT | 28.08.2013 | BE | 28.08.2013 | BG | 28.08.2013 | CY | 28.08.2013 | CZ | 28.08.2013 | DK | 28.08.2013 | EE | 28.08.2013 | ES | 28.08.2013 | FI | 28.08.2013 | IT | 28.08.2013 | LT | 28.08.2013 | LV | 28.08.2013 | MC | 28.08.2013 | MT | 28.08.2013 | PL | 28.08.2013 | RO | 28.08.2013 | SE | 28.08.2013 | SI | 28.08.2013 | SK | 28.08.2013 | TR | 28.08.2013 | GR | 29.11.2013 | IS | 28.12.2013 | PT | 30.12.2013 | IE | 28.03.2014 | LU | 28.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.03.2007 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 28.08.2013 | |
PT | 30.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003232937 (DIMAIO ANTHONY-JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1 * examples 1-5; claim 13; tables 1-3 * [I] 9-16; | [XI]US3923919 (STEARNS RICHARD S, et al) [X] 1,6 * column 11, line 34 - column 13, line 50; examples 1,IV; table 9 * * column 16, line 66 - column 17, line 48; claims 1,3,6,8 * * column 4, line 4 - column 4, line 42 * [I] 10-16; | [XI]WO9617902 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 12 - line 31; claims 1,2,25; tables 4,5 * [I] 10-16; | [XI]WO02070636 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * table 3 * [I] 9-16; | [XI]WO02064710 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * example 3; table 6 * [I] 9-16 | International search | [X]JP2004521976 ; | [X]JP2004521977 ; | [X]JP2004522848 ; | [X]JPH10510565 ; | [Y]JP2003505533 ; | [Y]JPH0192295 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [X]JP2005537383 ; | [X]JP2006502295 ; | [Y]JP2003041283 (NIPPON OIL CORP); | [XP]WO2006073198 (NIPPON OIL CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH0436391 | JPS63223094 | JPH08302378 | JPH093463 | JPH0468082 | JPH04120193 | JP2003041283 | JP2004262979 | JP2004262980 | WO9826030 | WO9931113 | - SAWA M.; NIWA M.; MURAKAMI Y., ZEOLITES, (1990), vol. 10, page 532 | - KARGE H.G.; DONDUR V., J. PHYS. CHEM., (1990), vol. 94, page 765 |