EP2001099 - BATTERY CHARGING DEVICE, 3-PHASE VOLTAGE GENERATION CIRCUIT, 3-PHASE VOLTAGE GENERATION METHOD, AND DELAY ANGLE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 2-1, Ohtemachi-2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000004 / JP | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2016/42] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states Shindengen Electric MFG. Co., Ltd. 2-1, Ohtemachi, 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000004 / JP | ||
For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Hidenori SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Factory, 10-13 Minami-cho Hanno-shi, Saitama 357-0036 / JP | 02 /
ARAI, Tatsuya SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Factory, 10-13 Minami-cho Hanno-shi, Saitama 357-0036 / JP | 03 /
YANAGISAWA, Takeshi HONDA R & D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 04 /
OTA, Atsuo HONDA R & D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Waks-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2016/42] |
Former [2008/50] | 01 /
SUZUKI, Hidenori SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Factory, 10-13 Minami-cho Hanno-shi, Saitama 357-0036 / JP | ||
02 /
ARAI, Tatsuya SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Factory, 10-13 Minami-cho Hanno-shi, Saitama 357-0036 / JP | |||
03 /
YANAGISAWA, Takeshi HONDA R & D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
04 /
OTA, Atsuo HONDA R & D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Waks-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2008/50] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07740351.7 | 29.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007JP56913 | Priority number, date | JP20060095504 | 30.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006095504 | [2008/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007114272 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2001099 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2001099 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2001099 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/14, H02P9/04, H02M7/219, H02M7/5387, H02J7/16 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
H02J7/163 (EP,US);
H02J7/1484 (EP,US);
H02M7/219 (EP,US);
H02P9/04 (EP,US);
H02M7/53871 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/50] | H02J7/14, H02P9/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2016/42] |
Former [2009/18] | DE, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BATTERIELADEGERÄT, SCHALTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON DREIPHASENSPANNUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON DREIPHASENSPANNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES VERZÖGERUNGSWINKELS | [2008/50] | English: | BATTERY CHARGING DEVICE, 3-PHASE VOLTAGE GENERATION CIRCUIT, 3-PHASE VOLTAGE GENERATION METHOD, AND DELAY ANGLE CONTROL METHOD | [2008/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHARGEMENT DE BATTERIE, CIRCUIT DE GÉNÉRATION DE TENSION TRIPHASÉE, PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE TENSION TRIPHASÉE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'ANGLE DE RETARD | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2008 | Translation filed | 23.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 24.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5886893 (ASAI KOICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3,4,7,9,11 * abstract * * figure 13 * * column 12, lines 8-18 ** column 13, lines 14-21 *; | [YA]US2005093520 (MURAMATSU SHUICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3,4,7,9,11 * abstract * * figures 1-4,8,13,19 * * paragraphs [0013] , [0048] , [0065] , [0066] , [0067] , [0068] , [0077] - [0078] - [0130] * [A] 2,5,6,8,10 | International search | [Y]JPH04210739 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [Y]JPH08298731 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [A]JPH1146456 (KOKUSAN DENKI CO); | [Y]JPH11136998 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2004140927 (KOKUSAN DENKI CO) | by applicant | JPH1052046 | JP2000188866 | JP2004194427 | JP2006095504 |