EP2003897 - IMAGE CODING APPARATUS AND METHOD, AND IMAGE DECODING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NODA, Reiko c/o IP Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
CHUJOH, Takeshi c/o IP Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07740633.8 | 30.03.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007JP57197 | Priority number, date | JP20060095597 | 30.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006095597 | WO2006JP320876 | 19.10.2006 Original published format: PCT/JP2006/320876 | [2008/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007114368 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2003897 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2003897 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/32, H04N7/36 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
H04N21/23892 (EP,US);
H04N19/146 (KR);
H04N19/117 (EP,US);
H04N19/126 (EP,US);
H04N19/14 (EP,US);
H04N19/174 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/184 (EP,US);
H04N19/40 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04N19/467 (EP,US);
H04N19/51 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,US);
H04N19/82 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/51] | H04N7/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/51] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BILDKODIERUNG SOWIE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BILDDEKODIERUNG | [2008/51] | English: | IMAGE CODING APPARATUS AND METHOD, AND IMAGE DECODING APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2008/51] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE CODAGE D'IMAGE, ET APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE DECODAGE D'IMAGE | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2008 | Translation filed | 17.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 25.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 16.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]WO02071735 (DEMOGRAFX [US], et al) [X] 1,21,22,24,42,44 * the whole document * [A] 5,6,8,14-17,23,25,26,34-37,41,43 [Y] 3,4,10,11,31-33 [I] 2,7,9,12,13,18-20,27-30,38-40; | [XAYI]WO03063491 (SNELL & WILCOX LTD [GB], et al) [X] 5,6,23,26 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,7,9,12,13,19-22,24,27-30,39-44 [Y] 8,10,11,14-17,25,31-37 [I] 18,38; | [XAY]EP1353514 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 41,43 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,5-7,9-13,18-24,26-33,38-40,42,44[Y] 3,4,8,14-17,25,34-37 | International search | [X]JPH04326667 ; | [Y]JP2003333603 ; | [Y]JP2005503734 ; | [Y]JPH09205647 ; | [A]JPH1127673 ; | [A]JPH06311506 | Examination | - DE WITH ET AL, "An MPEG Decoder with Embedded Compression for Memory Reduction", CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, 1998. ICCE. 1998 DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (19980602), doi:10.1109/ICCE.1998.678253, ISBN 978-0-7803-4357-3, pages 60 - 62, XP032462486 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCE.1998.678253 |