EP2012385 - FUEL CELL SYSTEM AND VEHICLE MOUNTED WITH FUEL CELL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA, Nobuo TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 07740774.0 | 27.03.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007JP57338 | Priority number, date | JP20060115268 | 19.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006115268 | [2009/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007122979 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2012385 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2012385 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/00, B60L11/18 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
H01M8/04701 (EP,US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
B60L50/50 (KR);
B60L58/30 (EP,US);
B60L58/33 (EP,US);
B60L58/34 (EP,US);
H01M8/04253 (EP,US);
B60L2260/54 (EP,US);
B60L2260/56 (EP,US);
H01M2250/20 (EP,US);
H01M8/04358 (EP,US);
H01M8/04447 (EP,US);
H01M8/04619 (EP,US);
H01M8/04753 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/31] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM UND FAHRZEUG MIT DEM BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM | [2009/02] | English: | FUEL CELL SYSTEM AND VEHICLE MOUNTED WITH FUEL CELL SYSTEM | [2009/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE ET VÉHICULE ÉQUIPÉ D'UN SYSTÈME DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2008 | Translation filed | 19.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 03.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004224191 (SKIBA TOMMY [US]) [X] 1,10-12,14 * paragraphs [0024] - [0033]; figure 2 *; | [A]JP2005011779 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [DX]JP2005267961 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [DX] 1,2,11,12,14 * paragraphs [0038] - [0047]; figure 4 *; | [X]US2005255351 (FUKUDA TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,10,12-14 * paragraphs [0085] - [0092]; figures 1A,1B,2A,2B,9A,9B *; | [AP]JP2006290033 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [AP] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2002313388 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2003257441 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2003317787 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2004055378 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2004153947 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2004290000 (EQUOS RES CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2004153947 | JP2005251576 | JP2005267961 |