EP1999200 - PRODUCTION METHOD OF POROUS FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
For all designated states National University Corporation Hokkaido University 8, Kita 8-jyo Nishi 5-chome Kita-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 060-0808 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMOMURA, Masatsugu c/o Hokkaido University Nanotech. Rsrch Ctr., Kita 21-jyo Nishi 10-chome Kita-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP | 02 /
YABU, Hiroshi c/o Hokkaido University Nanotech. Rsrch Ctr., Kita 21-jyo Nishi 10-chome Kita-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP | 03 /
MIKI, Yasufumi c/o Hokkaido University Nanotech. Rsrch Ctr., Kita 21-jyo Nishi 10-chome Kita-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP | 04 /
YAMAZAKI, Hidekazu FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | 05 /
ITO, Koju FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | [2013/27] |
Former [2008/50] | 01 /
SHIMOMURA, Masatsugu c/o Hokkaido University Nanotech. Rsrch Ctr., Kita 21-jyo Nishi 10-chome Kita-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP | ||
02 /
YABU, Hiroshi c/o Hokkaido University Nanotech. Rsrch Ctr., Kita 21-jyo Nishi 10-chome Kita-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP | |||
03 /
MIKI, Yasufumi c/o Hokkaido University Nanotech. Rsrch Ctr., Kita 21-jyo Nishi 10-chome Kita-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP | |||
04 /
YAMAZAKI, Hidekazu FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | |||
05 /
ITO, Koju FUJIFILM Corporation 210, Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/50] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07740808.6 | 27.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007JP57372 | Priority number, date | JP20060088613 | 28.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006088613 | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007114421 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1999200 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1999200 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/28, B29C41/28, B01D67/00 | [2013/07] | CPC: |
B29C41/28 (EP,US);
B29C41/12 (KR);
B01D67/003 (EP);
C08J5/18 (KR);
C08J9/28 (KR);
B01D2323/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/50] | C08J9/28, B29C41/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/19] |
Former [2008/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PORÖSEN FILMS | [2008/50] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD OF POROUS FILM | [2008/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PELLICULE POREUSE | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 29.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4954381 (CABASSO ISRAEL [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2003106487 (HUANG WEN-CHIANG [US]) [A] 1* paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0060] *; | [X]JP2003294905 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2003318010 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]JP2006070254 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) |