EP2063174 - BACKLIGHT DEVICE AND DISPLAY DEVICE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NITTOU, Eiji 1141-9, Gosana, Taki-cho Taki-gun, Mie 519-2157 / JP | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07741438.1 | 11.04.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007JP58002 | Priority number, date | JP20060248523 | 13.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006248523 | [2009/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008032460 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2063174 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13357, G02B6/00, F21V29/00, // F21S2/00, F21Y101/02 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
G02B6/0068 (EP,US);
G02B6/0085 (EP,US);
G02B6/0091 (EP,US);
G02F1/133603 (EP,US);
G02F1/133615 (EP,US);
G02F1/133628 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/22] | F21V29/00, F21S2/00, G02F1/13357, F21Y101/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Title | German: | HINTERBELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND DIESE VERWENDENDE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2009/22] | English: | BACKLIGHT DEVICE AND DISPLAY DEVICE USING SAME | [2009/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RETROECLAIRAGE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE UTILISANT CE DERNIER | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2009 | Translation filed | 27.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 13.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2011 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 21.11.2011 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/15] | 28.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2005114045 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7,12 * figures 36, 37, 39-42 * [I] 4,8-11; | GB2430071 [ ] (SHARP KK [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0083] - [0088]; figures 36, 37, 39-42 *; | [A]US2006082732 (MIWA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2006216244 (TOSHIBA MATSUSHITA DISPLAY TEC); | [Y]JP2006139245 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2001266606 (YAMADA SHOMEI LIGHTING); | [A]JP2001291406 (YAMADA SHOMEI LIGHTING); | [A]JP2002314146 (TOYODA GOSEI KK, et al) | by applicant | JP2005353507 | JP2006049098 | JP2006064733 |