EP2017301 - COMPOSITION OF WHICH CHIEF INGREDIENT IS POLYSACCHARIDES HAVING AN IMMUNOREGULATORY FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/04] | COMPOSITION COMPRISING POLYSACCHARIDE HAVING IMMUNOMODULATING FUNCTION AS MAIN INGREDIENT | ||
[2013/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERCIAN CORPORATION 5-8, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8305 / JP | [2009/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKATA, Ryoji 1-28-1105, Mitsuke-cho Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-0045 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Reiko 4-5-7-902, Sagamiohno Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 228-0803 / JP | 03 /
YANAI, Takaaki 3-10-28-405, Hon-cho Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0053 / JP | 04 /
KON-NO, Tomonori 82-13, Kashiwa-cho, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 241-0835 / JP | [2009/04] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/04] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07742027.1 | 20.04.2007 | [2009/04] | WO2007JP58591 | Priority number, date | JP20060121492 | 26.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006121492 | JP20060286171 | 20.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006286171 | [2009/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007125823 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2017301 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2017301 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08L5/00 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
C08L5/00 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61K31/715 (EP,US);
A61K36/185 (EP,US);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DIE ALS HAUPTBESTANDTEIL POLYSACCHARIDE MIT IMMUNMREGULIERENDER FUNKTION ENTHALTEN | [2013/35] | English: | COMPOSITION OF WHICH CHIEF INGREDIENT IS POLYSACCHARIDES HAVING AN IMMUNOREGULATORY FUNCTION | [2013/35] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT COMME INGREDIENT PRINCIPAL DES POLYSACCHARIDES AYANT UNE FONCTION IMMUNOREGULATRICE | [2013/35] |
Former [2009/04] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, ENTHALTEND POLYSACCHARID MIT IMMUNMODULIERENDER FUNKTION ALS HAUPTBESTANDTEIL | ||
Former [2009/04] | COMPOSITION COMPRISING POLYSACCHARIDE HAVING IMMUNOMODULATING FUNCTION AS MAIN INGREDIENT | ||
Former [2009/04] | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT UN POLYSACCHARIDE AYANT UNE FONCTION IMMUNOREGULATRICE EN TANT QU'INGREDIENT PRINCIPAL | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2008 | Translation filed | 20.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 24.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.04.2007 | AT | 30.10.2013 | BE | 30.10.2013 | BG | 30.10.2013 | CY | 30.10.2013 | CZ | 30.10.2013 | DK | 30.10.2013 | EE | 30.10.2013 | ES | 30.10.2013 | FI | 30.10.2013 | IT | 30.10.2013 | LT | 30.10.2013 | LV | 30.10.2013 | MC | 30.10.2013 | MT | 30.10.2013 | NL | 30.10.2013 | RO | 30.10.2013 | SE | 30.10.2013 | SI | 30.10.2013 | SK | 30.10.2013 | TR | 30.10.2013 | GR | 31.01.2014 | IS | 28.02.2014 | PT | 28.02.2014 | IE | 20.04.2014 | LU | 20.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.04.2007 | |
AT | 30.10.2013 | ||
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.04.2014 | ||
LU | 20.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.04.2014 | ||
LU | 20.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.04.2014 | ||
LU | 20.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.04.2014 | ||
LU | 20.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.04.2014 | ||
LU | 20.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 30.10.2013 | |
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 30.10.2013 | |
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 30.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - RYOJI TAKATA ET AL, "Immunostimulatory Effects of a Polysaccharide-Rich Substance with Antitumor Activity Isolated from Black Currant (Ribes nigrum L.)", BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY, AND BIOCHEMISTRY, (20051101), vol. 69, no. 11, doi:10.1271/bbb.69.2042, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 2042 - 2050, XP055001042 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.69.2042 | International search | [A]JPS5911302 (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD); | [A]JPH02215721 (KAO CORP); | [A]JPH02248401 (GODO SHUSEI KK); | [A]JPH02255094 (NIKKEN KASEI KK); | [A]JP2004107660 (MERCIAN CORP); | [AP]JP2006137712 (MERCIAN CORP); | [AP]JP2006213655 (MERCIAN CORP) | by applicant | JP2004107660 | - APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 60, pages 258 - 274 | - IN VIVO, (2003), vol. 17, pages 245 - 250 | - PHYTOTHER. RES., (2003), vol. 17, pages 1158 - 1164 | - JPN. J. PHARMACOL., (2002), vol. 90, pages 357 - 360 | - "The anti-allergic effects of lactic acid bacteria are strain dependent and mediated by effects on both Th1/Th2 cytokine expression and balance", INT. ARCH. ALLERGY IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 135, pages 205 - 215 | - INT. J. MOL. MED., (2004), vol. 14, pages 879 - 884 | - J. DAIRY SCI., (2005), vol. 88, pages 527 - 533 | - BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (2005), vol. 69, no. 11, pages 2042 - 2050 |