EP2009615 - DISPLAY DEVICE AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD, PATTERN DISPLAYING METHOD, AND BLIND DEVICE AND BLIND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikura, Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states Fujikura, Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome, Kohtoh-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMIKATANO, Mitsuru Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 02 /
TSUMANUMA, Takashi Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 03 /
KASHIMA, Takafumi Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-8550 / JP | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07742057.8 | 20.04.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007JP58622 | Priority number, date | JP20060117238 | 20.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006117238 | JP20070052910 | 02.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007052910 | [2009/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007123202 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2009615 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G09F13/18, F21V8/00, G02B6/00, G02F1/13357, F21Y101/02 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
G09F13/06 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0036 (EP,KR,US);
F21V7/05 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/006 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0065 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0076 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/22] |
Former [2009/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG, MUSTERANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND JALOUSIEANORDNUNG UND JALOUSIEVERFAHREN | [2009/01] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD, PATTERN DISPLAYING METHOD, AND BLIND DEVICE AND BLIND METHOD | [2009/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION, PROCEDE D'AFFICHAGE DE MOTIFS, ET DISPOSITIF D'OBTURATION ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2008 | Translation filed | 30.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 21.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/08] | 18.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS4845577U (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) [Y] 7* figure 3a *; | [Y]WO9516983 (KIM KWANG WON [KR]) [Y] 6,13,20 * abstract * * figures 1,4,6 *; | [X]US2004135273 (PARKER JEFFERY R [US], et al) [X] 17,18 * paragraph [0119] *; | [XYI]US2005057915 (TSAI KUN-JUNG [TW]) [X] 1-5,10-12,16,19,21,22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0020] , [0021] * * figures 1,3 * [Y] 6,7,13,20 [I] 8,9,14,15 | International search | [X]JP2001312233 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2002328633 (OKAYA ELECTRIC INDUSTRY CO); | [Y]JPH03189679 (SHINETSU POLYMER CO); | [Y]JP2003216076 (SHIMADA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK); | [Y]JPS4845577U ; | [Y]JP2003030924 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2005285390 (SEIKO INSTR INC); | [Y]JPH117261 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) | Examination | US2004042195 | by applicant | JP2006117238 | JP2007052910 | EP0995199 |