EP2141111 - SLIDING DOOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIRATSUKI, Akihide c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
SHIKAI, Masahiro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
UEDA, Takaharu c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07742262.4 | 24.04.2007 | [2010/01] | WO2007JP58827 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008136092 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2141111 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B66B13/26, E05F15/14, E05F15/20 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
E05F15/632 (EP,KR,US);
B66B13/26 (EP,KR,US);
B66B13/14 (KR);
B66B13/24 (KR);
E05F15/74 (EP,KR,US);
E05F2015/434 (US);
E05Y2900/104 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | B66B13/26, E05F15/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | SCHIEBETÜRVORRICHTUNG | [2010/01] | English: | SLIDING DOOR DEVICE | [2010/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PORTE COULISSANTE | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2009 | Translation filed | 14.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/52] | 08.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2003321177 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [AD] 1-6 * abstract *; | US2003209391 [ ] (SHIKAI MASAHIRO [JP] ET AL) [ ] * paragraphs [0063] - [0065]; figures 17-18; example 5 *; | [A]JP2002265175 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | EP1243544 [ ] (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0046] - [0048]; figures 22-23; example 8 *; | [A]JPS63104385U (UNKNOWN) [A] 3 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPH01176674U (UNKNOWN) [A] 4 * figures 1,2 * | International search | [X]JP2002265175 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [X]JP2003321177 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [X]JPS63104385U ; | [Y]JPH01176674U ; | [Y]JP2006527148 | by applicant | JP2003321177 |