EP2017094 - PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2009/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUNIYASU, Yasuaki@c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2011/35] |
Former [2009/04] | 01 /
KUNIYASU, Yasuaki Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/04] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07742736.7 | 01.05.2007 | [2009/04] | WO2007JP59301 | Priority number, date | JP20060129382 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006129382 | [2009/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007129638 | Date: | 15.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2017094 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2017094 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60C15/00, B60C15/06 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
B60C15/06 (EP,KR,US);
B60C15/00 (KR);
B60C15/0018 (EP,US);
B60C2015/009 (EP,US);
B60C2015/0614 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10819 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10828 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/23] |
Former [2009/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LUFTREIFEN | [2009/04] | English: | PNEUMATIC TIRE | [2009/04] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE | [2009/04] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2008 | Translation filed | 23.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 09.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5893605 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [Y] 1-3 * abstract *; | [DY]JP2005343334 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [DY] 1-3* paragraphs [0008] , [0010] - [0012]; figure 2 * | International search | [Y]JPS5893605 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [A]JPH0848118 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [Y]JP2004123049 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [Y]JP2005343334 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) | by applicant | JPS5893605 | JP2003170771 | JP2005343334 |