EP2036459 - VEHICLE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TS Tech Co., Ltd. 7-27, Sakae-cho 3-chome Asaka-shi Saitama 351-0012 / JP | [2012/52] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states TS Tech Co., Ltd 7-27, Sakae-cho 3-chome Asaka-shi Saitama 351-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Masami TS Tech Co., Ltd. 118-1, Oaza Ohta Takanezawa-machi Shioya-gun Tochigi 329-1217 / JP | [2012/52] |
Former [2009/12] | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Masami TS Tech Co., Ltd. 118-1, Oaza Ohta Takanezawa-machi Shioya-gun Tochigi 329-1217 / JP | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2012/52] |
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2009/50] | Wilson Gunn Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | ||
Former [2009/12] | Wilson Gunn Chancery House Chancery Lane GB-London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07742834.0 | 02.05.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007JP59399 | Priority number, date | JP20060128129 | 02.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006128129 | [2009/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007126119 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2036459 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2036459 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/38, B60N2/48 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
B60N2/859 (EP,US);
B60N2/841 (EP,US);
B60N2/844 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSITZ | [2009/12] | English: | VEHICLE SEAT | [2009/12] | French: | SIÈGE DE VÉHICULE | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2008 | Translation filed | 01.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.02.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 04.02.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.05.2007 | AT | 26.12.2012 | BE | 26.12.2012 | CY | 26.12.2012 | CZ | 26.12.2012 | DK | 26.12.2012 | EE | 26.12.2012 | FI | 26.12.2012 | IT | 26.12.2012 | LT | 26.12.2012 | LV | 26.12.2012 | MC | 26.12.2012 | MT | 26.12.2012 | NL | 26.12.2012 | PL | 26.12.2012 | RO | 26.12.2012 | SE | 26.12.2012 | SI | 26.12.2012 | SK | 26.12.2012 | TR | 26.12.2012 | BG | 26.03.2013 | GR | 27.03.2013 | ES | 06.04.2013 | IS | 26.04.2013 | PT | 26.04.2013 | IE | 02.05.2013 | LU | 02.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
TR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 02.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 02.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 02.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 26.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2006014950 (TS TEC KK, et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 7,8 * [Y] 4; | [XY]DE10335517 (FAURECIA AUTOSITZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0030]; figures 7,8 * [Y] 4 | International search | [X]JP2006014950 (TS TEC KK, et al) |