EP2018929 - WELDED STRUCTURE EXCELLENT IN BRITTLE-CRACKING PROPAGATION STOPPING CHARACTERISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0011 / JP | For all designated states Japan Marine United Corporation Mita Bellju Building 36-7, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [2013/42] |
Former [2009/05] | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0011 / JP | ||
For all designated states IHI Marine United Inc. 22-23, Kaigan 3-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0022 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANDA, Tsunehisa c/o IP Dep. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
KUBO, Takahiro c/o IP Dep. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 03 /
KAWABATA, Fumimaru c/o IP Dep. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 04 /
MURAOKA, Ryuji c/o IP Dep. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 05 /
SHIOMI, Hiroshi c/o IP Dep. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 06 /
NAKAJIMA, Yoshiyuki c/o IHI Marine United Inc., 22-23, Kaigan 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo; Tokyo 108-0022 / JP | 07 /
TOYODA, Masanobu c/o IHI Marine United Inc., 22-23, Kaigan 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo; Tokyo 108-0022 / JP | 08 /
NAKANISHI, Yasumasa c/o Ishikawajima-Harima Heavy Industries Co. 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | 09 /
KIJI, Noboru c/o Ishikawajima-Harima Heavy Industries Co. 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | [2015/33] |
Former [2009/05] | 01 /
HANDA, Tsunehisa c/o IP Dep. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | ||
02 /
KUBO, Takahiro c/o IP Dep. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWABATA, Fumimaru c/o IP Dep. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | |||
04 /
MURAOKA, Ryuji c/o IP Dep. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | |||
05 /
SHIOMI, Hiroshi c/o IP Dep. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | |||
06 /
NAKAJIMA, Yoshiyuki c/o IHI Marine United Inc., 22-23, Kaigan 3-chome, Minato-ku, Tokyo; Tokyo 108-0022 / JP | |||
07 /
TOYODA, Masanobu c/o IHI Marine United Inc., 22-23, Kaigan 3-chome, Minato-ku, Tokyo; Tokyo 108-0022 / JP | |||
08 /
NAKANISHI, Yasumasa c/o Ishikawajima-Harima Heavy Industries Co. 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | |||
09 /
KIJI, Noboru c/o Ishikawajima-Harima Heavy Industries Co. 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/33] |
Former [2009/05] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07743252.4 | 08.05.2007 | [2009/05] | WO2007JP59817 | Priority number, date | JP20060133487 | 12.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006133487 | JP20060282132 | 17.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006282132 | [2009/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007132794 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2018929 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2018929 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/02, B23K9/00, B63B3/34 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
B23K33/00 (EP,KR);
B23K33/004 (EP,KR);
B23K9/0256 (KR);
B63B3/34 (KR);
F16L57/02 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DK [2015/33] |
Former [2009/23] | DK | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GESCHWEISSTE STRUKTUR MIT HERVORRAGENDEN SPRÖDBRUCHAUSBREITUNGSANHALTEEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2009/05] | English: | WELDED STRUCTURE EXCELLENT IN BRITTLE-CRACKING PROPAGATION STOPPING CHARACTERISTICS | [2009/05] | French: | STRUCTURE SOUDÉE PRÉSENTANT D'EXCELLENTES CAPACITÉS À ARRÊTER LA PROPAGATION DE FISSURES FRAGILES | [2009/05] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2008 | Translation filed | 22.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 13.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPI]EP1674187 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-4,7 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-3 * [I] 5,6,8,9 | International search | [X]JPH08267234 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [X]JPH0596369 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [X]JPS491707B | by applicant | JP2004232052 | - YAMAGUCHI ET AL., "Development of Mega-Container Carrier -Practical Use of New High-Strength Heavy Gauge Steel Plate", BULLETIN OF THE JAPAN SOCIETY OF NAVAL ARCHITECTS AND.OCEAN ENGINEERS, (2005), vol. 3, page 70 |