EP2019121 - POLYCARBONATE RESIN AND OPTICAL MATERIAL COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [2009/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANAGAWA, Tatsuya Kashima Plant of Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. 35, Higashiwada Kamisu-shi, Ibaraki 3140102 / JP | 02 /
ANDOU, Kazuhiro Kashima Plant of Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. 35, Higashiwada Kamisu-shi, Ibaraki 3140102 / JP | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/05] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07743438.9 | 16.05.2007 | [2009/05] | WO2007JP60003 | Priority number, date | JP20060135937 | 16.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006135937 | [2009/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007132874 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2019121 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08G64/14, G11B7/24, G11B7/253 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
C08G64/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08G64/40 (KR);
C08L69/00 (KR);
G11B7/2534 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYCARBONATHARZ UND DIESES UMFASSENDES MATERIAL | [2009/05] | English: | POLYCARBONATE RESIN AND OPTICAL MATERIAL COMPRISING THE SAME | [2009/05] | French: | RÉSINE POLYCARBONATE ET MATÉRIAU OPTIQUE COMPRENANT LADITE RÉSINE | [2009/05] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2008 | Translation filed | 11.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 09.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/40] | 19.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPS60203632 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO); | [X]JPH01156323 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [X]JPH01156322 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [X]JPH01155301 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [X]JPH0218501 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO); | [X]JPH0419667 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [X]JPH06298926 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [A]JPH09100348 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD); | [X]JP2003128906 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD); | [A]JP2004526817 ; | [A]JP2005529995 | by applicant | JPS63182350 | WO2004021343 |