EP2042188 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING HCV INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokyo Metropolitan Institute of Medical Science 1-6, Kamikitazawa 2-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156-8506 / JP | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP | [2012/01] |
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states Tokyo Metropolitan Organization for Medical Research 8-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOHARA, Michinori 3-15-3-408, Tabata Kita-ku Tokyo 114-0014 / JP | 02 /
UMEHARA, Takuya 2-3-15-203, Tabata Kita-ku Tokyo 114-0014 / JP | 03 /
SUDO, Masayuki CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 200, Kajiwara Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 247-8530 / JP | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/14] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07743451.2 | 16.05.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007JP60016 | Priority number, date | JP20060136992 | 16.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006136992 | [2009/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007132882 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2042188 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/21, A61K45/00, A61P1/16, A61P31/12, A61P35/00 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
A61K38/21 (EP,KR);
A61K31/197 (KR);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER PRÄVENTION VON HCV-INFEKTION | [2009/14] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING HCV INFECTION | [2009/14] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE DESTINÉE AU TRAITEMENT OU À LA PRÉVENTION D'UNE INFECTION PAR LE VHC | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2008 | Translation filed | 05.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 11.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/46] | 22.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0037097 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [X] 6 * abstract *; | [X]WO2004078127 (INTERMUNE INC [US], et al) [X] 6 * abstract *; | [X]WO2005062949 (INTERMUNE INC [US], et al) [X] 6 * abstract *; | [X] - SAKAMOTO H ET AL, "Host sphingolipid biosynthesis as a target for hepatitis C virus therapy", NATURE CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20051101), vol. 1, no. 6, doi:10.1038/NCHEMBIO742, ISSN 1552-4450, pages 333 - 337, XP003010463 [X] 5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nchembio742 | [XP] - UMEHARA ET AL, "Serine palmitoyltransferase inhibitor suppresses HCV replication in a mouse model", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20060721), vol. 346, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2006.05.085, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 67 - 73, XP005485804 [XP] 1-19 * Discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2006.05.085 | International search | [Y]WO2006016657 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2005005372 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2004511513 ; | [Y]JP2005533108 ; | [Y]JP2005533824 | by applicant | WO2006016657 | WO2004071503 | WO2005005372 | JP2980569B | - GLUE, P. ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2000), vol. 32, pages 647 - 653 | - REDDY, K.R. ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2001), vol. 33, pages 433 - 438 | - ROSENBERG, S., J MOL BIOL, (2001), vol. 313, pages 451 - 464 | - AIZAKI, H. ET AL., VIROLOGY, (2004), vol. 324, pages 450 - 461 | - GAO, L. ET AL., J VIROL, (2004), vol. 78, pages 3480 - 3488 | - FUJITA, T. ET AL., J ANTIBIOT (TOKYO, (1994), vol. 47, pages 208 - 215 | - MIYAKE, Y ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1995), vol. 211, pages 396 - 403 | - SIMONS, K.; IKONEN, E., NATURE, (1997), vol. 387, pages 569 - 572 | - SAKAMOTO, H. ET AL., NAT CHEM BIOL, (2005), vol. 1, pages 333 - 337 | - NAT CHEM BIOL., (200511), vol. 1, no. 6, pages 333 - 7 | - NAT CHEM BIOL., (200511), vol. L, no. 6, pages 333 - 7 | - J. M. BUZAYAN, NATURE, (1986), vol. 323, page 349 | - K. TAIRA ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1990), vol. 3, page 733 | - A. M. DZAIANOTT; J. J. BUJARSKI, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, page 4823 | - C. A. GROSSHANDS; R. T. CECH, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1991), vol. 19, page 3875 | - K. TAIRA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1991), vol. 19, page 5125 | - N. YUYAMA ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1992), vol. 186, page 1271 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1990), vol. 87, pages 2264 - 2268 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - TAKEUCHI, T. ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1999), vol. 116, pages 636 - 642 |