EP2154222 - MODIFIER FOR SILICATE-CONTAINING FIBROUS SUBSTANCE, METHOD OF MODIFYING THE SAME AND MODIFIED MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Morizane, Toshinori 26-12, Hazawa 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 176-0003 / JP | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07743723.4 | 14.05.2007 | [2010/07] | WO2007JP60288 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008139635 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2154222 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/00, A62D3/30, B09B3/00, C01B33/26, D06M11/79, A62D101/41, A62D101/47, D06M101/00 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
D06M11/79 (EP,US);
A62D3/36 (EP,US);
C01B33/20 (EP,US);
C01B33/26 (EP,US);
C01B33/32 (EP,US);
A62D2101/41 (EP,US);
D06M2101/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | MODIFIKATOR FÜR SILICATHALTIGEN FASERSTOFF, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN MODIFIZIERUNG SOWIE MODIFIZIERTES MATERIAL | [2010/07] | English: | MODIFIER FOR SILICATE-CONTAINING FIBROUS SUBSTANCE, METHOD OF MODIFYING THE SAME AND MODIFIED MATERIAL | [2010/07] | French: | MODIFICATEUR POUR SUBSTANCE FIBREUSE CONTENANT DES SILICATES, PROCÉDÉ DE MODIFICATION CORRESPONDANT, ET MATÉRIAU AINSI MODIFIÉ | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2009 | Translation filed | 02.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 16.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH03150262 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN); | [A]JP2000514397 ; | [A]JP2000514396 ; | [A]JP2003094006 (A & A MATERIAL CORP, et al); | [A]JPH04226677 (KALI CHEMIE AG); | [A]JPH01246123 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN, et al); | [A]JPH0768167 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN, et al); | [A]JPH0710750B | by applicant | JPH06340470 | JPH0710750B |