EP2071689 - DISCHARGER AND DISCHARGE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph & Telephone Corporation 3-1 Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Akira c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 1808585 / JP | 02 /
SHODAI, Takahisa c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 1808585 / JP | 03 /
MIYASAKA, Akihiro c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 1808585 / JP | 04 /
KITANO, Riichi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 1808585 / JP | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07744125.1 | 25.05.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007JP60691 | Priority number, date | JP20060274070 | 05.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006274070 | [2009/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008044360 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2071689 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/00 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
H01M10/44 (EP,US);
H02J7/00308 (EP);
H01M10/345 (EP,US);
H02J2207/20 (EP,US);
H02J7/0013 (EP,US);
H02J7/00306 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | ENTLADEVORRICHTUNG UND ENTLADUNGSSTEUERVERFAHREN | [2009/25] | English: | DISCHARGER AND DISCHARGE CONTROL METHOD | [2009/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉCHARGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE CORRESPONDANT | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2009 | Translation filed | 25.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/21] | 17.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08223909 (RICOH KK) | by applicant | JP2004119112 | JP2004120856 | JP2004120857 |