EP2025487 - TIRE VULCANIZING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIMENO, Shinya c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | 02 /
MIKI, Youjirou c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | 03 /
YAMAGUCHI, Tadayoshi c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07744420.6 | 30.05.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007JP61007 | Priority number, date | JP20060152201 | 31.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006152201 | [2009/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007139160 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2025487 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/02, B29C35/02, B29L30/00 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
B29D30/0601 (EP,US);
B29D30/0016 (EP,US);
B29D30/0603 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2009/30] |
Former [2009/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFENVULKANISIERVORRICHTUNG | [2009/08] | English: | TIRE VULCANIZING DEVICE | [2009/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VULCANISATION DE PNEU | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2008 | Translation filed | 04.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 06.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 19.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0709179 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 15 - column 16, line 58 * * column 19, line 12 - column 26, line 12; figures 1-28; claims 1-7 *; | [X]US6582212 (MITAMURA HISASHI [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column 1, lines 13-37 * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 46 ** column 3, line 63 - column 5, line 59; figures 1-5; claims 1-11 *; | [X]EP1424182 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0009] , [0011] , [0041] - [0043] - [0118] - [0149] - [0168] - [0201]; figures 1-19; claims 1-36 * | International search | [Y]JPH03150111 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [Y]JPH07117055 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [Y]JPH11262921 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [X]JP2000158447 (ICHIMARU GIKEN KK); | [A]JP2004122407 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) | by applicant | JP2004122407 |