EP2023146 - ANALYSIS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/07] | ANALYSIS DEVICE, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND COMMUNICATION PROGRAM | ||
[2018/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 250 S. Kraemer Boulevard Brea, CA 92821 / US | [2018/30] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 250 S. Kraemer Boulevard Brea, 92821 CA / US | ||
Former [2010/17] | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 4300 North Harbor Boulevard Mail Code A-42-C Fullerton, California 92834 / US | ||
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUSHITA, Atsushi c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2018/30] |
Former [2009/07] | 01 /
MATSUSHITA, Atsushi c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [2018/30] |
Former [2009/07] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07744474.3 | 31.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007JP61065 | Priority number, date | JP20060152590 | 31.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006152590 | [2009/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007139179 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2023146 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2023146 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00, H05K7/14 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
G01N35/00732 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00326 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00811 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00821 (EP,US);
G01N35/025 (EP,US);
Y10T436/11 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/30] |
Former [2009/34] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | UNTERSUCHUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/10] | English: | ANALYSIS DEVICE | [2018/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE | [2018/10] |
Former [2009/07] | ANALYSEVORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSPROGRAMM | ||
Former [2009/07] | ANALYSIS DEVICE, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND COMMUNICATION PROGRAM | ||
Former [2009/07] | DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE, PROCEDE DE COMMUNICATION ET PROGRAMME DE COMMUNICATION | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2008 | Translation filed | 25.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 06.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09274044 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US6640273 (SPISAK KEVIN C [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 6 - column 5, line 32 *; | [A]JPH11233974 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0011] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]JPH04262594 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0015] * | International search | [Y]JPH09274044 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH11233974 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JPH04262594 (FUJITSU LTD) | by applicant | JPH09274044 |