EP2031022 - SILICONE RUBBER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOK Corporation 12-15 Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8585 / JP | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Takeshi c/o NOK Corporation 3-1, Tsujidoshinmachi 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0042 / JP | 02 /
OTSUKA, Masaya c/o NOK Corporation 2089, Nagakusa Aso-Shi, Kumamoto 869-2231 / JP | 03 /
KUDO, Masashi c/o NOK Corporation 3-1, Tsujidoshinmachi 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0042 / JP | [2013/36] |
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
SATO, Takeshi c/o NOK Corporation 3-1, Tsujidoshinmachi 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0042 / JP | ||
02 /
OTSUKA, Masaya c/o NOK Corporation 2089, Nagakusa Aso-Shi, Kumamoto 869-2231 / JP | |||
03 /
KUDO, Masashi c/o NOK Corporation 3-1, Tsujidoshinmachi 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0042 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/10] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07745354.6 | 15.06.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007JP62099 | Priority number, date | JP20060167223 | 16.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006167223 | [2009/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007145313 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2031022 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2031022 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/07, C08L83/06 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
F16J15/102 (EP,US);
C08G77/20 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08G77/80 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/10] | C08L83/07 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/29] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SILIKONKAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2009/10] | English: | SILICONE RUBBER COMPOSITION | [2009/10] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC DE SILICONE | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2008 | Translation filed | 16.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 17.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP10193965.0 / EP2319889 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JPH0517688 (TOSHIBA SILICONE) [I] 1-8,10 * example 4 * * the whole document * [Y] 1-8,10; | [Y]US4158617 (ELDRED ROGER J) [Y] 1-8,10 * column 3, lines 15-36 * * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH0517688 (TOSHIBA SILICONE); | [A]JPH06287304 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN) | Examination | US3341490 | GB938701 | by applicant | JP2003028302 | JP2004076870 | - KE138 Y-U, SHIN-ETSU SILICONE CO., LTD. | - DY32-379U, DOW CORNING CO., LTD. | - FE271-U, SHIN-ETSU SILICONE CO., LTD. |