EP2011265 - REPETITIVE TRANSMISSIONS FOR OFDM USING DIFFERENT PHASE SEQUENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/02] | REPETITIVE TRANSMISSIONS IN MULTI-CARRIER BASED WIRELESS ACCESS TECHNIQUES | ||
[2017/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [2018/08] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Moon-Il Saeteo Mauel Hyundai Hometown Apt. 717-501 Jukjeon-Dong, Suji-Gu, Yongin Gyeonggi-do, 448-160 / KR | 02 /
CHUN, Jin-Young Joongang Heightsville Apt. Na-302 339-13, Guro 2-Dong, Guro-Gu Seoul, 152-052 / KR | 03 /
CHANG, Jae-Won Baeksong Maeul 7-danji Imgwang Apt. 705-1205 Baekseok-Dong, Ilsan-Gu, Goyang Gyeonggi-do, 410-721 / KR | 04 /
JUNG, Jin-Hyuk 302 1250-8, Sa 1-Dong, Sangnok-Gu, Ansan Gyeonggi-do, 426-171 / KR | [2018/08] |
Former [2009/02] | 01 /
LEE, Moon-Il Saeteo Mauel Hyundai Hometown Apt. 717-501 Jukjeon-Dong, Suji-Gu, Yongin Gyeonggi-do, 448-160 / KR | ||
02 /
CHUN, Jin-Young Joongang Heightsville Apt. Na-302, 339-13, Guro 2-Dong, Guro-Gu Seoul, 152-052 / KR | |||
03 /
CHANG, Jae-Won Baeksong Maeul 7-danji Imgwang Apt. 705-1205 Baekseok-Dong, Ilsan-Gu, Goyang Gyeonggi-do, 410-721 / KR | |||
04 /
JUNG, Jin-Hyuk 302 1250-8, Sa 1-Dong, Sangnok-Gu, Ansan Gyeonggi-do, 426-171 / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/08] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2009/02] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07745867.7 | 06.04.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007KR01704 | Priority number, date | US20060790972P | 10.04.2006 Original published format: US 790972 P | KR20060064452 | 10.07.2006 Original published format: KR 20060064452 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007117100 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2011265 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2011265 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/08, H04B7/06, H04B7/12, H04L1/00, H04L1/06, H04L27/26, // H04L1/18 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
H04B7/0671 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0623 (KR);
H04B7/0697 (KR);
H04B7/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0006 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0625 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/08 (EP,US);
H04L1/1816 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/1819 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/02] | H04L1/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REPETITIVE ÜBERTRAGUNGEN FÜR OFDM MITTELS SEQUENZEN MIT VERSCHIEDENEN PHASEN | [2017/40] | English: | REPETITIVE TRANSMISSIONS FOR OFDM USING DIFFERENT PHASE SEQUENCES | [2017/40] | French: | TRANSMISSIONS RÉPÉTITIVES POUR OFDM À L'AIDE DE SEQUENCES AVEC PHASES DIFFÉRENTES | [2017/40] |
Former [2009/02] | WIEDERHOLTE ÜBERTRAGUNGEN IN DRAHTLOSEN ZUGANGSTECHNIKEN AUF MEHRTRÄGERBASIS | ||
Former [2009/02] | REPETITIVE TRANSMISSIONS IN MULTI-CARRIER BASED WIRELESS ACCESS TECHNIQUES | ||
Former [2009/02] | TRANSMISSIONS RÉPÉTITIVES METTANT EN OEUVRE DES TECHNIQUES D'ACCÈS SANS FIL FONDÉES SUR DES MULTI-PORTEUSES | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 22.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.04.2007 | AT | 21.02.2018 | CY | 21.02.2018 | CZ | 21.02.2018 | DK | 21.02.2018 | EE | 21.02.2018 | ES | 21.02.2018 | FI | 21.02.2018 | IT | 21.02.2018 | LT | 21.02.2018 | LV | 21.02.2018 | MC | 21.02.2018 | NL | 21.02.2018 | PL | 21.02.2018 | PT | 21.02.2018 | RO | 21.02.2018 | SE | 21.02.2018 | SI | 21.02.2018 | SK | 21.02.2018 | TR | 21.02.2018 | IE | 06.04.2018 | LU | 06.04.2018 | MT | 06.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | BG | 21.05.2018 | GR | 22.05.2018 | IS | 21.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 06.04.2007 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 06.04.2018 | ||
LU | 06.04.2018 | ||
MT | 06.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 06.04.2018 | ||
LU | 06.04.2018 | ||
MT | 06.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 06.04.2018 | ||
LU | 06.04.2018 | ||
MT | 06.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 06.04.2018 | ||
LU | 06.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003137926 (JOO PAN-YUH [KR], et al) [A] 1-6,8-14 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0093] * * figure 3 *; | [XA]US2005180353 (HANSEN CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,9,11-14 * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0189] * * figures 10, 35 * [A] 2,10; | [A] - NEC, "HARQ Downlink Signaling", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-041126 NEC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20040916), vol. RAN WG1, no. Seoul, Korea; 20040916, XP050099330 [A] 1-6,8-14 * section 4; figure 6 * | [XPA] - SHIN E-S ET AL, "OFDM TIMING ESTIMATION METHOD WITHOUT TRAINING SYMBOL", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (200605), vol. E89-B, no. 5, doi:10.1093/IETCOM/C89-B.5.1718, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 1718 - 1721, XP001246203 [XP] 1,3-6,8,9,11-14 * section 3; figure 1 * [A] 2,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ietcom/c89-b.5.1718 | International search | [A]US6842487 (LARSSON PETER [SE]); | [A]EP1605607 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US2005180353 |