EP2010576 - BIS-ARYLARYLOXY CATALYTIC SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING ETHYLENE HOMOPOLYMERS OR ETHYLENE COPOLYMERS WITH ALPHA-OLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Innovation Co., Ltd. 99, Seorin-dong Jongro-gu Seoul 110-110 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states SK Innovation Co., Ltd. 99, Seorin-dong Jongro-gu Seoul 110-110 / KR | ||
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states SK Innovation Co., Ltd. 99, Seorin-dong Jongro-gu Seoul 110-110 / KR | ||
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states SK Energy Co., Ltd. 99, Seorin-dong Jongro-gu Seoul 110-110 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OK, Myung Ahn 209-302, Kyungnamhonorsvil Apt. Yongsan-dong, Yusung-gu Daejeon 305-500 / KR | 02 /
HAHN, Jong Sok 211-1702, Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong -gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | 03 /
SHIN, Dae Ho 304-1303, Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong -gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | 04 /
KANG, Sang Ook 101-1706, Simgok Premio Apt. Sanghyeon-dong, Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-130 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Tae Jin 102-502, Hangang Apt. 29, Dangsan-dong 4-ga Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-044 / KR | [2013/30] |
Former [2009/02] | 01 /
OK, Myung Ahn 209-302, Kyungnamhonorsvil Apt. Yongsan-dong, Yusung-gu Daejeon 305-500 / KR | ||
02 /
HAHN, Jong Sok 211-1702, Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong -gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | |||
03 /
SHIN, Dae Ho 304-1303, Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong -gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | |||
04 /
KANG, Sang Ook 101-1706, Simgok Premio Apt. Sanghyeon-dong, Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-130 / KR | |||
05 /
KIM, Tae Jin 102-502, Hangang Apt. 29, Dangsan-dong 4-ga Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-044 / KR | Representative(s) | Comoglio, Elena, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Comoglio, Elena, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2009/02] | Comoglio, Elena, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A Corso Emilia, 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 07746162.2 | 24.04.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007KR02000 | Priority number, date | KR20060036840 | 24.04.2006 Original published format: KR 20060036840 | KR20070039034 | 20.04.2007 Original published format: KR 20070039034 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007123362 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2010576 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2010576 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C07F17/00, C08F4/6592 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
C07F17/00 (EP,US);
C08F4/649 (BR,KR);
C08F10/00 (EP,BR,KR,US);
C08F12/00 (BR);
C08F210/16 (EP,BR,US);
C08F4/16 (KR);
C08F4/64 (KR);
C08F10/02 (BR);
C08F110/02 (EP,BR,US);
C08F210/02 (BR);
C08F2420/04 (EP,BR,US);
C08F32/00 (BR);
C08F4/65908 (EP,BR,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,BR,US);
C08F4/65925 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/03 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/03 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/02] | C08F4/649 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/22] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BISARYLARYLOXY-KATALYSATORSYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ETHYLEN-HOMOPOLYMEREN ODER ETHYLEN-COPOLYMEREN MIT ALPHA-OLEFINEN | [2009/02] | English: | BIS-ARYLARYLOXY CATALYTIC SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING ETHYLENE HOMOPOLYMERS OR ETHYLENE COPOLYMERS WITH ALPHA-OLEFINS | [2009/02] | French: | SYSTÈMES CATALYTIQUES BIS-ARYLARYLOXY UTILISÉS POUR PRODUIRE DES HOMOPOLYMÈRES D'ÉTHYLÈNE OU DES COPOLYMÈRES D'ÉTHYLÈNE AVEC DES ALPHA-OLÉFINES | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 25.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPH11166010 [ ] (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2003231693 (KANTO KAGAKU) [A] 1; | [Y]EP1426386 (MARUZEN PETROCHEM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * example - *; | [Y] - NOMURA, KOTOHIRO ET AL, "Catalyst component and catalysts for olefin", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1999:392740, URL: STN, XP002639935 [Y] 1-12 * abstract * | [Y] - HORI, JUNICHI ET AL, "Production method of aryloxy metallocene compounds as polymerization catalysts", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2003:646712, URL: STN, XP002639934 [Y] 1-12 * abstract * | [Y] - METZ M V ET AL, "WEAKLY COORDINATING AL-, NB-, TA-, Y-, AND LA-BASED PERFLUOROARYLOXYMETALATE ANIONS AS COCATALYST COMPONENTS FOR SINGLE-SITE OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION", ORGANOMETALLICS, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20020902), vol. 21, no. 18, doi:10.1021/OM020087S, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 3691 - 3702, XP001126455 [Y] 1-12 * page 3701, column rh * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om020087s | [A] - NOMURA, KOTOHIRO ET AL, "Olefin Polymerization by (Cyclopentadienyl)(aryloxy)titanium(IV) Complexes-Cocatalyst Systems", MACROMOLECULES ( 1998 ), 31(22), 7588-7597 CODEN: MAMOBX; ISSN: 0024-9297, (1998), XP000788802 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma980690f | International search | [A]JP2002053607 (MARUZEN PETROCHEM CO LTD); | [A]JP2003231693 (KANTO KAGAKU); | [A] - KRESINSKI R.A. ET AL., "Cyclopentadienyl replacement by tripyrazolylborate and the syntheses of M(5-C5H5){HB(C3H3N2)3}X2 (M=hafnium, X=CI;M=zirconium, X=Cl, OPh.OC6H4-4-NO2,OC6H4-4-OMe, OC6H4-2-Ph)", POLYHEDRON, vol. 9, no. 17, pages 2185 - 2187, XP009067264 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0277-5387(00)84053-X | [A] - BESANCON J. ET AL., "Metallocene series. XXXI. Synthesis of di-w-aryloxy-di-pi-cyclopentadienylasymmetric titanium compounds and the selective substitution of ligands", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 96, no. 1, pages 63 - 70, XP008131811 | by applicant | EP0416815 | EP0420436 | US5043408 | US5079205 | US5198401 | EP0842939 | JPH11166010 | KR20010074722 | US6329478 |