EP2014103 - MULTIVIEW AUTOSTEREOSCOPIC DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHESTAK, Sergey 140-1401 Hwanggol Maeul Jugong 1-danji Apt. Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-740 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Dae-Sik 824-706 Woosung Apt. 973-3 Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-811 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Sung-Yong (303) 1044-4 Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-815 / KR | [2015/50] |
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
SHESTAK, Sergey 140-1401 Hwanggol Maeul Jugong 1-danji Apt. Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-740 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Dae-Sik 824-706 Woosung Apt. 973-3 Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-811 / KR | |||
03 /
JUNG, Sung-Yong (303) 1044-4 Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-815 / KR | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2015/50] |
Former [2009/03] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07746168.9 | 25.04.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007KR02007 | Priority number, date | US20060797372P | 04.05.2006 Original published format: US 797372 P | KR20060067302 | 19.07.2006 Original published format: KR 20060067302 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007129819 | Date: | 15.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014103 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2014103 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, H04N13/04 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
H04N13/351 (EP,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N13/305 (EP,US);
H04N13/32 (EP,US);
H04N13/349 (EP,US);
H04N13/354 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/03] | H04N13/00 | Designated contracting states | IT, NL [2015/50] |
Former [2009/24] | IT, NL | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUTOSTEREOSKOPISCHE ANZEIGE MIT MEHREREN ANSICHTEN | [2009/03] | English: | MULTIVIEW AUTOSTEREOSCOPIC DISPLAY | [2009/03] | French: | AFFICHAGE AUTOSTEREOSCOPIQUE A VUES MULTIPLES | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 05.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.12.2015 | [2016/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0833183 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2003107805 (STREET GRAHAM STEWART BRANDON [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6108064 (MINOURA KIYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US6611243 (MOSELEY RICHARD ROBERT [GB], et al); | [A]US2005052859 (LAZAREV PAVEL I [US], et al) |