EP2046943 - LACTIC ACID BACTERIA ISOLATED FROM MOTHER'S MILK WITH PROBIOTIC ACTIVITY AND INHIBITORY ACTIVITY AGAINST BODY WEIGHT AUGMENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioneer Corporation 49-3, Moonpyung-Dong Daedeok-Gu Daejon 306-220 / KR | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Ji Hee B-201 Sooam Villa, 760-45 Sujeong 3-dong Dong-gu Busan 601-817 / KR | 02 /
YOU, Byeung Il 205-306 Seonbi Maeul Apt. Songchon-dong, Daedeok-gu Daejeon 306-776 / KR | 03 /
YUN, Sung Il 211 Donpo-ri Seonjang-myeon Asan-si Chungcheongnam-do 336-892 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Han Oh 208-601 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | [2013/25] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
KANG, Ji Hee B-201 Sooam Villa, 760-45 Sujeong 3-dong Dong-gu Busan 601-817 / KR | ||
02 /
YOU, Byeung Il 205-306 Seonbi Maeul Apt. Songchon-dong, Daedeok-gu Daejeon 306-776 / KR | |||
03 /
YUN, Sung Il 211 Donpo-ri Seonjang-myeon Asan-si Chungcheongnam-do 336-892 / KR | |||
04 /
PARK, Han Oh 208-601 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2013/25] | Smart, Peter John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2009/16] | Smart, Peter John Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07746512.8 | 14.05.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007KR02363 | Priority number, date | KR20060073722 | 04.08.2006 Original published format: KR 20060073722 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008016214 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2046943 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2046943 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, C07K14/335, C12N15/31, A61K35/74, A23L1/30, // C12R1/225 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
A23C9/1234 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,KR,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07K14/335 (EP,US);
C12N15/09 (KR);
C12N15/10 (KR);
A23V2400/145 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/16] | C12N1/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUS MUTTERMILCH ISOLIERTE MILCHSÄUREBAKTERIEN MIT PROBIOTISCHER AKTIVITÄT UND HEMMAKTIVITÄT GEGEN KÖRPERGEWICHTSZUNAHME | [2009/16] | English: | LACTIC ACID BACTERIA ISOLATED FROM MOTHER'S MILK WITH PROBIOTIC ACTIVITY AND INHIBITORY ACTIVITY AGAINST BODY WEIGHT AUGMENTATION | [2009/16] | French: | BACTÉRIE D'ACIDE LACTIQUE ISOLÉE À PARTIR DE LAIT MATERNEL À ACTIVITÉ PROBIOTIQUE ET À ACTIVITÉ INHIBITRICE DIRIGÉE CONTRE L'AUGMENTATION DU POIDS CORPOREL | [2009/16] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 15.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.05.2007 | AT | 19.06.2013 | BE | 19.06.2013 | CY | 19.06.2013 | CZ | 19.06.2013 | EE | 19.06.2013 | FI | 19.06.2013 | IT | 19.06.2013 | LT | 19.06.2013 | LV | 19.06.2013 | MC | 19.06.2013 | MT | 19.06.2013 | PL | 19.06.2013 | RO | 19.06.2013 | SE | 19.06.2013 | SI | 19.06.2013 | SK | 19.06.2013 | TR | 19.06.2013 | BG | 19.09.2013 | GR | 20.09.2013 | ES | 30.09.2013 | IS | 19.10.2013 | PT | 21.10.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.05.2007 | |
AT | 19.06.2013 | ||
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 19.06.2013 | |
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 19.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004003235 (PULEVA BIOTECH SA [ES], et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document * | International search | [A]US2004115179 (LIU YU-JU [TW], et al); | [A]US6808703 (PARK HAN OH [KR], et al); | [A]US6942857 (SONG SU HAN [KR], et al); | [A]US7001756 (HSU CHING-HSIANG [TW], et al); | [X] - MAJHENIC A.C. ET AL., "DNA analysis of the genes encoding acidocin LF221 A and acidocin LF221 B, two bacteriocins produced by Lactobacillus gasseri LF221", APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2004), vol. 63, pages 705 - 714, XP008102577 | [X] - "Lactobacillus gasseri putative complement factor, acidocin LF221B, and putative immunity protein genes, complete cds, and unknown genes", GENBANK, Database accession no. (AY297947), XP008102573 | [X] - KAWAI YASUSHI ET AL., "Primary Amino Acid and DNA Sequences of Gassericin T, a Lactacin F-Family Bacteriocin Produced by Lactobacillus gasseri SBT2055", BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (2000), vol. 64, no. 10, pages 2201 - 2208, XP008102567 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.64.2201 | [X] - "Lactobacillus gasseri gassericin T gene region (ORF1, ORF2, ORF3, gatA, gatX, ORF6) complete cds", GENBANK, Database accession no. (AB029612), XP008102572 | by applicant | WO2004003235 | - MAJHENIC A. C. ET AL., "DNA analysis of the genes encoding acidoin LF221A and acidocin LF221B, two bacteriocins produced by Lactobacillus gasserei LF221", APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2004), vol. 63, pages 705 - 714 | - GASSERICIN T, "a Lactacin F-family Bacteriocin Produced by Lactobacillus gasserei SBT20055", BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM, (2000), vol. 64, no. 10, pages 2201 - 2208 |