EP2021373 - VCAM-1 SPECIFIC MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanwa Chemical Corporation Hanwa Bldg., 1, Janggyo-dong Jung-gu, Seoul 100-797 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states Hanwa Chemical Corporation Hanwa Bldg., 1 Janggyo-dong Jung-gu, Seoul 100-797 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUNG, Junho 116-109 Yongheung Woobang Town Yongheung-dong Buk-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 791-754 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Ji Eun 614-1503 6 Danji Eunbitmaeul Hwajeong 1-dong Deokyang-gu, Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 412-748 / KR | 03 /
RYU, Eun Kyung 118-34 Cheongpa-dong 3-ga Yongsan-gu Seoul 140-133 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Sukmook 61-169 Cheongryangni 1-dong Dongdaemun-gu Seoul 130-867 / KR | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07746794.2 | 31.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007KR02647 | Priority number, date | US20060803521P | 31.05.2006 Original published format: US 803521 P | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007139359 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2021373 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/46 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
C07K16/2836 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VCAM-1-SPEZIFISCHER MONOKLONALER ANTIKÖRPER | [2009/07] | English: | VCAM-1 SPECIFIC MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY | [2009/07] | French: | ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL VCAM-1 SPÉCIFIQUE | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 01.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 09.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0623173 (BIOGEN INC [US]) [I] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003095969 (LOBB ROY R [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document * * in particular examples; claims 12 and 15 *; | [I] - TSUKAMOTO K ET AL, "ADMINISTRATION OF MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AGAINST VASCULAR CELL ADHESION MOLECULE-1/VERY LATE ANTIGEN-4 ABROGATES PREDISPOSING AUTOIMMUNE DIABETES IN NOD MICE", CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, US LNKD- DOI:10.1006/CIMM.1995.1205, (19951015), vol. 165, no. 2, ISSN 0008-8749, pages 193 - 201, XP001097592 [I] 1-21 * abstract * * page 194, right-hand column * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cimm.1995.1205 | [I] - SORIANO ANTONIO ET AL, "VCAM-1, but not ICAM-1 or MAdCAM-1, immunoblockade ameliorates DSS-induced colitis in mice", LABORATORY INVESTIGATION, (200010), vol. 80, no. 10, ISSN 0023-6837, pages 1541 - 1551, XP009132544 [I] 1-21 * abstract; pg. 1548, left-hand column * | [I] - RANDOLPH DAVID A ET AL, "Cooperation between Th1 and Th2 cells in a murine model of eosinophilic airway inflammation", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (199910), vol. 104, no. 8, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 1021 - 1029, XP009132542 [I] 1-21 * abstract; page 1023, right-hand column * | [I] - PEPINSKY B ET AL, "STRUCTURE-FUNCTION STUDIES ON VASCULAR CELL ADHESION MOLECULE-1", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 267, no. 25, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 17820 - 17826, XP009132543 [I] 1-15 * abstract * | [I] - YANASE ET AL, "Investigative Urology: Cytokines Modulate in Vitro Invasiveness of Renal Cell Carcinoma Cells Through Action on the Process of Cell Attachment to Endothelial Cells", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0022-5347(01)67733-4, (19950301), vol. 153, no. 3, ISSN 0022-5347, pages 844 - 848, XP005580180 [I] 16-21 * use of anti-VCAM-1 monoclonal antibody supressed invasion of carcinoma cells;; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-5347(01)67733-4 | International search | [A]US5827670 (MASINOVSKY BORIS [US], et al) | [Y] - STONE P.C.W. ET AL., "Transmigrated neutrophils down-regulate the expression of VCAM-1 on endothelial cells and inhibit the adhesion of flowing lymphocytes", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY, (20040930), vol. 77, no. 1, pages 44 - 51, XP008092119 | [Y] - AZIMZADEH A. ET AL., "Antibodies to thuman adhesion molecules and von Willebrand factor: in vitro cross-species reactivity in the xenotransplantation setting", XENOTRANSPLANTATION, (199811), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 284 - 291, XP008092049 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1399-3089.1998.tb00039.x | [Y] - GROOBY W.L. ET AL., "Anti-ovine VCAM-1 monoclonal antibodies inhibit adhesion and proliferation between sheep endothelial and mononuclear cells in vitro", IMMUNOLOGY AND CELL BIOLOGY, (199712), vol. 75, no. 6, pages 546 - 553, XP008090772 | [Y] - CARTER R.A. ET AL., "Vascular cell adhesion molecule-1 (VCAM-1) blockade in collagen-induced arthritis reduces joint involvement and alters B cell trafficking", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, (200204), vol. 128, no. 1, pages 44 - 51, XP008090672 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2249.2002.01794.x | [Y] - SZEKANECZ Z. AND KOCH A.E., "Therapeutic inhibition of leukocyte recruitment in inflammatory diseases", CURRENT OPINION IN PHARMACOLOGY, (200408), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 423 - 428, XP008090734 | by applicant | WO9314220 | - KOSTELNY ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1992), vol. 148, page 15467 | - PACK, PLUCKTHUN, BIO- CHEMISTTY, (1992), vol. 31, page 1579 | - GRUBER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), page 5368 | - ZHU ET AL., PROTEIN SCI., (1997), vol. 6, page 781 | - HU ET AL., CANCER RES., (1996), vol. 56, page 3055 | - ADAMS ET AL., CANCER RES., (1993), vol. 53, page 4026 | - MCCARTNEY ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1995), vol. 8, page 301 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - KOEHER, MILSTEINM, NATURE, (1976), vol. 256, page 495 |