EP2033204 - PASTE, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING PLASMA DISPLAY PANEL USING THE PASTE AND PLASMA DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOH, Jung Sok 642 Jinpyung-dong Gumi-si Kyungsangbuk-do 730-360 / KR | 02 /
SEO, Young Woo 642 Jinpyung-dong Gumi-si Kyungsangbuk-do 730-360 / KR | 03 /
HAN, Chang Min 642 Jinpyung-dong Gumi-si Kyungsangbuk-do 730-360 / KR | [2009/19] |
Former [2009/11] | 01 /
NOH, Jung Sok 108-304 Hangaram Apt 809, Gyomun-dong Guri-si, Kyunggi-do 471-020 / KR | ||
02 /
SEO, Young Woo 100-1 Hyoja-dong 2ga, Wansan-ku Jeonju-si, Jeonrabuk-do 560-242 / KR | |||
03 /
HAN, Chang Min 104-503 Gyungdong Wints Ville 731-1 Poongho-dong Jinhae-si, Kyungsangnam-do 645-320 / KR | Representative(s) | Palmer, Jonathan R., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Palmer, Jonathan R., et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 07747108.4 | 26.06.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007KR03086 | Priority number, date | KR20060059574 | 29.06.2006 Original published format: KR 20060059574 | KR20060059575 | 29.06.2006 Original published format: KR 20060059575 | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008002055 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2033204 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/49, H01J17/04, H01J9/02 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
H01J11/24 (EP,US);
C03C8/14 (EP,US);
C03C8/18 (EP,US);
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H01J9/02 (EP,US);
H01J2211/225 (EP,US);
H01J2211/444 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/11] | H01J17/49 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/30] |
Former [2009/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEBSTOFF, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE PLASMAANZEIGETAFEL MIT DEM KLEBSTOFF UND PLASMAANZEIGEGERÄT | [2009/11] | English: | PASTE, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING PLASMA DISPLAY PANEL USING THE PASTE AND PLASMA DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2009/11] | French: | PÂTE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉCRAN PLASMA UTILISANT LADITE PÂTE ET ÉCRAN PLASMA | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 29.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/47] | 03.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2000048645 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,5-9,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0016] , [0036] , [0081] , [0098] , [0115] * [Y] 12,14; | [X]US2002048730 (HATORI SAKURAKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,15 * paragraph [0244]; figure 1 *; | [XY]JP2003016928 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] , [0017] - paragraph [0020] * [Y] 11-14; | [X]JP2004087495 (TAIYO INK MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,5,15 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065]; figure 1 *; | [XY]US2006071202 (LEE BEOM-WOOK [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0039] , [0041] * [Y] 11,13; | [E]EP1950766 (DU PONT [US]) [E] 1,2* paragraphs [0021] , [0100]; table 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2001297691 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JP2003346667 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); | [A]JP2005063797 (PIONEER PLASMA DISPLAY CORP); | [X]US2005130547 (OIDA OSAMU [JP], et al) |