EP2032887 - PIPE CLIP WITH VIBRATION-ISOLATING INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. van Walraven Holding B.V. Industrieweg 5 3641 RK Mijdrecht / NL | [2009/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN WALRAVEN, Jan Prins Bernhardlaan 6 3641 GP Mijdrecht / NL | [2010/07] |
Former [2009/11] | 01 /
VAN WALRAVEN, Jan 6, Prins Bernhardlaan NL-3641 GP Mijdrecht / NL | Representative(s) | Houben, Christiaan Hein Willem Frans Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Houben, Christiaan Hein Willem Frans Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 07747343.7 | 26.06.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007NL00161 | Priority number, date | NL20061032064 | 27.06.2006 Original published format: NL 1032064 | [2009/11] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008002129 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | NL | [2008/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2032887 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2032887 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/035 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
F16L55/035 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49986 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHRKLAMMER MIT SCHWINGUNGSISOLIERENDEM EINSATZ | [2009/11] | English: | PIPE CLIP WITH VIBRATION-ISOLATING INSERT | [2009/11] | French: | ATTACHE DE TUYAU COMPORTANT UN INSERT ANTI-VIBRATIONS | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2007 | Translation filed | 28.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 03.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09170685.3 / EP2133617 | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.02.2010 | CY | 17.02.2010 | EE | 17.02.2010 | FI | 17.02.2010 | LT | 17.02.2010 | LV | 17.02.2010 | MT | 17.02.2010 | RO | 17.02.2010 | SI | 17.02.2010 | SK | 17.02.2010 | TR | 17.02.2010 | BG | 17.05.2010 | GR | 18.05.2010 | IS | 17.06.2010 | PT | 17.06.2010 | IE | 26.06.2010 | LU | 26.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
IE | 26.06.2010 | ||
LU | 26.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
IE | 26.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
IE | 26.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
IE | 26.06.2010 | ||
IT | 26.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2982505 (GEORGE SHY HARRY) [X] 14,15 * figure - *; | [X]US3159708 (DEAL ROBERT S) [X] 14,15 * figure - *; | [X]US3165793 (LYNCH WILLIAM R) [X] 22-36 * figure - *; | [X]GB1115527 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR) [X] 22-36* figure - *; | [XA]DE7732253U (PFITZMANN, WOLFGANG, 2090 WINSEN) [X] 14 * figure - * [A] 1-13; | [XA]US4318518 (DAVIS LYNWOOD A) [X] 14,15 * abstract * [A] 1-13; | [XY]GB2181698 (DRAFTEX IND LTD) [X] 22-40 * abstract * [Y] 41-44; | [XY]US5722131 (LEISTNER VOLKMAR W [CA], et al) [X] 14,15 * abstract * [Y] 41-44 | by applicant | GB1173913 | EP0975908 |