EP2025185 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RADIO NETWORK PLANNING WITH HSDPA ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie Voor Toegepast-Natuurweten Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUSTAFSSON, Nils Anders Stefan Brassersplein 2 NL-2612 CT Delft / NL | 02 /
LITJENS, Remco Brassersplein 2 NL-2612 CT Delft / NL | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07747467.4 | 23.05.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007NL50244 | Priority number, date | EP20060076098 | 23.05.2006 Original published format: EP 06076098 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007136270 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2025185 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2025185 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/18 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
H04W16/18 (EP,US);
H04W8/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/08] | H04Q7/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR FUNKNETZPLANUNG MIT HSDPA-ANALYSE | [2009/08] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RADIO NETWORK PLANNING WITH HSDPA ANALYSIS | [2009/08] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UNE PLANIFICATION DE RÉSEAU RADIO AVEC ANALYSE HSDPA | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 20.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | CY | 30.06.2010 | CZ | 30.06.2010 | DK | 30.06.2010 | EE | 30.06.2010 | FI | 30.06.2010 | HU | 30.06.2010 | IT | 30.06.2010 | LT | 30.06.2010 | LV | 30.06.2010 | MT | 30.06.2010 | PL | 30.06.2010 | RO | 30.06.2010 | SE | 30.06.2010 | SI | 30.06.2010 | SK | 30.06.2010 | TR | 30.06.2010 | BG | 30.09.2010 | GR | 01.10.2010 | ES | 11.10.2010 | IS | 30.10.2010 | PT | 02.11.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
MT | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
TR | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
MT | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
MT | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6810246 (KALOFONOS DIMITRIS N [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 1, line 47 - column 3, line 10 ** column 18, lines 6-62 *; | [A]US2005055196 (COHEN ALAIN J [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] - [0017] - [0020] - [0024] , [0025] , [0027] - [0033] - [0040] *; | [AD] - TURKE U ET AL, "HSDPA Performance Analysis in UMTS Radio Network Planning Simulations", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2004. VTC 2004-SPRING. 2004 IEEE 59TH MILAN, ITALY 17-19 MAY 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20040517), vol. 5, ISBN 0-7803-8255-2, pages 2555 - 2559, XP010766718 [AD] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2004.1391383 | [AD] - OLIN B ET AL, "A novel approach to WCDMA radio network dimensioning", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2004. VTC2004-FALL. 2004 IEEE 60TH LOS ANGELES, CA, USA 26-29 SEPT. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040926), ISBN 0-7803-8521-7, pages 3443 - 3447, XP010787515 [AD] 1-21 * page 3443, paragraph I * * page 3446, paragraph IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2004.1404703 |