EP2043450 - OIL-BASED ADDITIVE FOR A BEVERAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friesland Brands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL | [2010/49] |
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states Friesland Brands B.V. Blankenstein 142 7943 PE Meppel / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEGMAN, Edwin, Aart Kampland 7 NL-8375 HE Oldemarkt / NL | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2009/15] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07747537.4 | 28.06.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007NL50315 | Priority number, date | NL20061032076 | 28.06.2006 Original published format: NL 1032076 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008002139 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2043450 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2043450 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A23C11/02, A23L1/19, A23L2/39, A23G1/56, A23L1/40 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
A23G1/56 (EP);
A23C11/04 (EP);
A23D9/007 (EP);
A23D9/05 (EP);
A23L2/39 (EP);
A23L23/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/1886 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Title | German: | ZUSATZSTOFF AUF ÖLBASIS FÜR EIN GETRÄNK | [2012/05] | English: | OIL-BASED ADDITIVE FOR A BEVERAGE | [2009/15] | French: | ADDITIF À BASE D'HUILE POUR UNE BOISSON | [2009/15] |
Former [2009/15] | GETRÄNKZUSATZSTOFF AUF ÖLBASIS | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.06.2012 | CY | 27.06.2012 | DK | 27.06.2012 | EE | 27.06.2012 | FI | 27.06.2012 | LT | 27.06.2012 | LV | 27.06.2012 | MT | 27.06.2012 | SK | 27.06.2012 | IE | 28.06.2012 | LU | 28.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | BG | 27.09.2012 | GR | 28.09.2012 | IS | 27.10.2012 | PT | 29.10.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/34] | BE | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 28.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | BE | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 28.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 28.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | BE | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | BE | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | BE | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | BE | 27.06.2012 | |
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | BE | 27.06.2012 | |
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 27.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2279202 (ALBERT MUSHER) [X] 1-8 * page 1, column 2, line 47 - page 2, column 1, line 57; examples I,II * * page 3, column 1, line 35 - line 45 *; | [X]US2278469 (ALBERT MUSHER) [X] 1-8 * examples II,III,IV,V,VI,VII,VIII * * page 7, column 1, lines 19-26 *; | [X]US2278466 (ALBERT MUSHER) [X] 1-8 * page 5, column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 2; example VI *; | [A]US2005276900 (ULLANOORMADAM SAHASRANAMAM R [MY]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0011] , [0018] , [0019] * * claims 30,31,41,66 *; | [A]EP0455288 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-8 * example III *; | [A]WO2005006887 (RAISIO GROUP PLC [FI], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 3, lines 13-17 * * example 2 *; | [A] - CALLIAUW G ET AL, "Production of cocoa butter substitutes via two-stage static fractionation of palm kernel oil", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, (200511), vol. 82, no. 11, ISSN 0003-021X, pages 783 - 789, XP001249173 [A] 1-8 * table 3 * |