EP2135472 - A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR MANAGING SIGNALING PEAK LOADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLECKERT, Peter Polhemsgatan 4 S-752 31 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
MOLANDER, Anders Karl Dahlgrensgatan 21 S-582 28 Linköping / SE | 03 /
SCHLIWA-BERTLING, Paul Hjalmar Svenfelts väg 29B S-590 71 Ljungsbro / SE | 04 /
ÖSTRUP, Peter Tinnerbäcksgränd 51 S-587 50 Linköping / SE | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07748389.9 | 10.04.2007 | [2009/52] | WO2007SE50228 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008123811 | Date: | 16.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2135472 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00, H04W60/04 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
H04W60/04 (EP,US);
H04W28/0226 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | H04W4/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/52] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG VON SIGNALISIERUNGSSPITZENLASTEN | [2009/52] | English: | A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR MANAGING SIGNALING PEAK LOADS | [2009/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE LA SIGNALISATION DE CHARGES DE POINTE | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 20.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 28.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/47] | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1463362 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,8-11,14-17 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * [I] 6,7,12,13,18,19; | [XI]US5574728 (MAMAGHANI FARZAN [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12,14-18 * column 2, line 27 - column 2, line 65 * * column 4, line 29 - column 6, line 13 * [I] 7,13,19; | [XAI]US6064889 (FEHNEL MICHAEL DAVID [US]) [X] 1-4,8-10,14-16 * column 13, line 32 - column 15, line 2 * [A] 6,12,18 [I] 5,7,11,13,17,19; | [XA]US2003198245 (BRADFORD G PATTON [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,14-16 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] * [A] 3,5-7,11-13,17-19; | [A]EP1653763 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | International search | [X]EP1058473 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [A]EP1460869 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | [A]WO9742779 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]WO0228116 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) |