EP2156211 - DETERMINING POSITIONING OF WIRELESS TERMINAL IN TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIGREN, Torbjörn Ekvägen 9 756 53 Uppsala / SE | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07748403.8 | 12.04.2007 | [2010/08] | WO2007SE50242 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008127161 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2156211 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/00, H04Q7/38 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
G01S5/14 (EP,US);
G01S5/0273 (EP,US);
G01S19/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG DER POSITIONIERUNG EINES DRAHTLOSEN ENDGERÄTS IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2010/08] | English: | DETERMINING POSITIONING OF WIRELESS TERMINAL IN TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2010/08] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DU POSITIONNEMENT D'UN TERMINAL SANS FIL DANS UN RÉSEAU DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 18.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 21.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2011/44] | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5999124 (SHEYNBLAT LEONID [US]) [Y] 1-4,9,10* col. 4, l. 66 to col. 6, l. 20 col. 11, l. 6-19 col. 12, l. 28 to col. 13, l. 47 col. 14, l. 48-56 *; | [Y] - OMA, "Secure User Plane Location Architecture", ANNOUNCEMENT OPEN MOBILE ALLIANCE, XX, XX, (20070209), pages 1 - 50, XP003020373 [Y] 1-4,9,10 * p. 14, 20, 22, 23 * | International search | [A]US2006063536 (KIM WUK [KR], et al); | [A]US2007037586 (KIM JOO-YOUNG [KR], et al); | [A]EP1773076 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [X] - OMA, "Secure User Plane Location Architecture", DRAFT VERSION 3.0; OPEN MOBILE ALLIANCE; OMA-AD_SUPPL-V2_0-20070209-D, (20070209), URL: http://www.member.openmobilealliance.org/ftp/public_documents/loc/Permanent_documents/OMA-AD_SUPPL_V2_0-20070209-D.zip, XP003020373 |