EP2010565 - METHOD FOR RECOMBINANT PROTEIN PRODUCTION IN CHO CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agency for Science, Technology and Research 1 Fusionopolis Way No 20-10 Connexis Singapore 138632 / SG | [2012/08] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Agency for Science, Technology and Research 1 Fusionopolis Way No 20-10 Connexis Singapore 138632 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Yih Yean Bioprocessing Technology Institute 20 Biopolis Way 06-01 Centros Singapore 138668 / SG | 02 /
WONG, Kathy Bioprocessing Technology Institute 20 Biopolis Way 06-01 Centros Singapore 138668 / SG | [2012/08] |
Former [2009/02] | 01 /
LEE, Yih Yean Bioprocessing Technology Institute 20 Biopolis Way 06-01 Centros Singapore 138668 / SG | ||
02 /
WONG, Kathy Bioprocessing Technology Institute 20 Biopolis Way 06-01 Centros Singapore 138668 / SG | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Schwepnitzer Str. 2 01097 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2009/02] | Richards, William John, et al K.R. Bryer & Co. 7 Gay Street Bath, BA1 2PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07748645.4 | 16.04.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007SG00100 | Priority number, date | US20060745289P | 21.04.2006 Original published format: US 745289 P | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007123489 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2010565 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2010565 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/715, C12N15/85, C12N5/16 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
C07K14/7156 (EP,US);
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
C12N5/00 (EP,US);
C12N2501/07 (EP,US);
C12N2510/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PRODUKTION VON REKOMBINANTEM PROTEIN IN CHO-ZELLEN | [2009/02] | English: | METHOD FOR RECOMBINANT PROTEIN PRODUCTION IN CHO CELLS | [2009/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PROTÉINE RECOMBINANTE DANS DES CELLULES CHO | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 19.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.04.2007 | AT | 22.02.2012 | BE | 22.02.2012 | CY | 22.02.2012 | CZ | 22.02.2012 | EE | 22.02.2012 | IT | 22.02.2012 | LT | 22.02.2012 | LV | 22.02.2012 | MT | 22.02.2012 | PL | 22.02.2012 | RO | 22.02.2012 | SE | 22.02.2012 | SI | 22.02.2012 | SK | 22.02.2012 | TR | 22.02.2012 | LU | 16.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | BG | 22.05.2012 | GR | 23.05.2012 | ES | 02.06.2012 | IS | 22.06.2012 | PT | 22.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
LU | 16.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 22.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004157289 (SALERNO JOHN C [US], et al) [X] 33,35,36,42,43 * figure 4 *; | [X]WO2005010046 (BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,9,23,26,27,29,32,34,37,39,42 * example 5; claim 9 *; | [X] - LEE YONG J ET AL, "Alteration of heat sensitivity by introduction of HSP70 or anti-HSP70 antibody in CHO cells", JOURNAL OF THERMAL BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 18, no. 4, ISSN 0306-4565, pages 229 - 236, XP002449657 [X] 1,6,9,12-16,26 * the whole document * | [X] - HUOT J ET AL, "INCREASED SURVIVAL AFTER TREATMENTS WITH ANTICANCER AGENTS OF CHINESE HAMSTER CELLS EXPRESSING THE HUMAN M-R 27000 HEAT SHOCK PROTEIN", CANCER RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 51, no. 19, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 5245 - 5252, XP002449658 [X] 1,4,6,7,12-16,26 * the whole document * | [Y] - LAVOIE J ET AL, "SEQUENCE OF THE CHINESE HAMSTER SMALL HEAT SHOCK PROTEIN HSP27", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1990), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 0305-1048, page 1637, XP002449659 [Y] 33,35,36,39,43 * the whole document * | [Y] - "Heat shock protein beta-1 (HspB1) (Heat shock 27 kDa protein) (HSP 27).", UniProt, (19900401), Database accession no. P15991, URL: EBI [Y] 33,35,36,39,43 * abstract * | [X] - LANDRY J ET AL, "HEAT SHOCK RESISTANCE CONFERRED BY EXPRESSION OF THE HUMAN HSP27 GENE IN RODENT CELLS", JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (1989), vol. 109, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9525, pages 7 - 16, XP002449660 [X] 1,4,6,7,27 * the whole document * | [X] - GAESTEL MATTHIAS ET AL, "Structure and organisation of a murine gene encoding small heat-shock protein Hsp25", GENE (AMSTERDAM), (1993), vol. 128, no. 2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 279 - 283, XP002449661 [X] 33,35,38,42 * figure 1 * | [X] - "Heat shock protein beta-1 (HspB1) (Heat shock 27 kDa protein) (HSP 27) (Growth-related 25 kDa protein) (P25) (HSP25).", UniProt, (19900401), Database accession no. P14602, URL: EBI [X] 33,35,38,42 | [X] - HE H ET AL, "HSP70 and heat shock factor 1 cooperate to repress Ras-induced transcriptional activation of the c-fos gene.", CELL STRESS & CHAPERONES NOV 2000, (200011), vol. 5, no. 5, ISSN 1355-8145, pages 406 - 411, XP002449707 [X] 1,2,4,6,9,26,27,29,32 * page 407; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1379/1466-1268(2000)005<0406:HAHSFC>2.0.CO;2 | by applicant | US2004157289 | WO2005010046 |