EP2005234 - ULTRA-WIDE ANGLE OBJECTIVE LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ning, Alex 2122 Sea Island Place San Marcos CA 92078 / US | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, et al Jungblut & Seuss Patentanwälte Wittestraße 30 J 13509 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, et al JUNGBLUT & SEUSS Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Strasse 10 10589 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07748927.6 | 15.01.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007US01106 | Priority number, date | US20060791032P | 10.04.2006 Original published format: US 791032 P | US20060794786P | 24.04.2006 Original published format: US 794786 P | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007120370 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2005234 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B13/06, G02B13/04, G02B13/18 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
G02B13/06 (EP,US);
G02B13/18 (EP,US);
G02B9/60 (EP,US);
G02B9/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Title | German: | ULTRAWEITWINKELOBJEKTIV | [2008/52] | English: | ULTRA-WIDE ANGLE OBJECTIVE LENS | [2008/52] | French: | OBJECTIF ULTRA GRAND-ANGULAIRE | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 12.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/02] | 04.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.11.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 16.11.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6377404 (GOOSEY JR WILLIAM T [US]) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0026]; figures 1,4 *; | [X]US6781770 (CHANG KUO WEN [TW], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0019]; figure 1 *; | [X]US4957355 (SATO HARUO [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2005099091 (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [DA]US7023628 (NING ALEX [US]) [DA] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2002072085 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] * abstract *; | [X]JPH04267212 (COPAL CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0468307 (CHINON IND INC) [A] * abstract * |